Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition et al v. Fola Coal Company, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy and Sierra Club |
Defendant: |
Fola Coal Company, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv21588 |
Filed: |
August 8, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Kanawha |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Chambers |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
33 U.S.C. § 1365 Environmental Matters |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 2, 2017 |
Filing
193
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 183 MOTION for an Interim Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs; and AWARDS attorneys' fees amounting to $420,790.80 and expenses for Appalachian Mountain Advocates in the amount of $101,115.44 and Public Justice in the amount of $3,578.38. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/2/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
|
June 7, 2016 |
Filing
161
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF staying its decision on a specific remedy and directing FOLA to submit, within fourteen days of the bench trial's conclusion, a proposed plan for collecting water flow and quality data for Road Fork and Cogar Hollow, as more fully set forth herein; directing the Parties to appear for periodic case management conferences; appointing Mr. James H. Kyles as Special Master of engineering. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/7/2016. (cc: attys, the Special Master, and any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing
119
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding that Plaintiffs have established that the Defendant has committed at least one violation of its permits for Mine No. 2 and Mine No. 6 by discharging into Road Fork and Cogar Hollow high levels of ionic pollution, which have caused or materially contributed to a significant adverse impact to the chemical and biological components of the applicable streams aquatic ecosystem, in violation of the narrative water quality standards that are incorporated into those permits. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/12/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Jurisdictional Issues as set forth more fully herein; denying Defendant's 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/29/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?