Woodruff v. Thornsbury et al
Plaintiff: Robert Woodruff
Defendant: Nathan Glanden, Jeff Cline, Jay Smithers, Brandon Moore, Steven D. Canterbury, Jarrod Fletcher, Michael Thornsbury, City of Gilbert, West Virginia and Commissioners of the Mingo County Commission
Case Number: 2:2013cv24001
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Mingo
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's 224 MOTION to Intervene. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/13/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Mr. Woodruff's 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Michael Thornsbury; denying Mr. Thornsbury's 144 MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying Trooper Moore's 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/17/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 17 MOTION by Brandon Moore to Dismiss 1 Complaint; denying as moot 35 MOTION by Nathan Glanden to Dismiss 1 Complaint; denying as moot 38 MOTION by City of Gilbert, West Virginia to Dismiss 1 C omplaint; denying as moot 40 MOTION by Robert Woodruff to Find 22 MOTION by Michael Thornsbury to Dismiss 1 Complaint Due to Insufficient Service of Process Moot Under Principles of Res Judicata and Collateral Estoppel; granting 80 MOTION by Robert Woodruff to Amend 1 Complaint; directing that the 63 First Amended Complaint is filed nunc pro tunc on 1/31/2014; denying as moot 74 MOTION by Michael Thornsbury to Dismiss 63 First Amended Complaint; denying without prejudice 89 MOT ION by Robert Woodruff to Dismiss Defendant Jeff Cline re: 1 Complaint; granting conditionally 66 MOTION by Nathan Glanden to Dismiss 63 First Amended Complaint; by 5/23/2014, Mr. Wooodruff may attempt to amend the operative pleading to allege further facts that would state a plausible state or federal claim against Officer Glanden; granting conditionally 95 MOTION by Michael Sparks to Dismiss 1 Complaint and 98 AMENDED MOTION by Michael Sparks to Dismiss 1 Complaint; by 5/23/2014 , Mr. Woodruff may attempt to amend the operative pleading to allege further facts that would state a plausible state or federal claim against Mr. Sparks; granting 6 MOTION by Jay Smithers to Dismiss 1 Complaint; granting 28 MOTION by Steven D. Canterbury to Dismiss 1 Complaint; denying 70 MOTION by Brandon Moore to Dismiss 63 First Amended Complaint except to the extent that he is not liable under federal or state law for any claims directly based upon his grand jury testimony. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/8/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant Michael Thornsbury's 22 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint Due to Insufficient Service of Process; denying defendant Michael Thornsbury's 41 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Service of Proce ss and to Stay Deadlines Set Forth in the Court's 32 Order and Notice Until Such Time as a Ruling on the Effectiveness of Plaintiff's Service of Process Attempt is Issued. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/18/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodruff v. Thornsbury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Glanden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Smithers
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Moore
Represented By: J. Victor Flanagan
Represented By: Kevin J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Canterbury
Represented By: John M. Hedges
Represented By: Stephanie J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Fletcher
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thornsbury
Represented By: William R. Slicer
Represented By: Philip B. Sword
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gilbert, West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioners of the Mingo County Commission
Represented By: R. Carter Elkins
Represented By: Natalie N. Koerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Woodruff
Represented By: Richard Neely
Represented By: Joshua R. Martin
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?