United States of America v. 0.64 Acre of Land, More or Less, Situate in Logan County, State of West Virginia et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 0.64 Acre of Land, More or Less, Situate in Logan County, State of West Virginia and W. P. Henritze
Case Number: 2:2014cv17685
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the United States' 31 MOTION to Withdraw Jury Demand in these consolidated actions; directing that the United States has no further financial obligation to the interested parties; that the United States is directed to serve upon the interested parties, by certified mail return receipt requested, by 9/8/2015, a copy of this memorandum opinion and order; that the interested parties are noticed that their failure to object in writing to the proposed dist ribution herein by 9/28/2015, will result in the entry of a Judgment directing the Clerk to pay out those sums listed herein to the distributes set forth on page 10 hereof. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/25/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that 2:13-cv-17685 and 2:14-cv-17688 are consolidated for all further pretrial proceedings and trial; the .64 Acre of Land case is designated as the lead case; all further filings shall be captioned and docketed in that case; directing that the United States be given leave to file a dispositive motion no later than 3/23/2015, serving a copy thereof on each of the potential interested parties; the pretrial conference is scheduled for 4/3/2015 at 3:00 p.m.; directing the United States to send forthwith a copy of this memorandum opinion and order to the potential interested parties. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the United States' 25 MOTION for default judgment; the trial of this matter, and any subsequently consolidated action, is scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on 4/14/2015; the United States to report to the court concerning the suitability of consolidating this action for trial with what appears to be a related case, United States v. 0.19 Acre of Land, 2:14-17688, by 2/13/2015; the United States to send a copy of this memorandum opinion and order, and n otice of any intervening consolidation order, to the potential interested parties by 2/25/2015; the United States is given leave to file a dispositive motion by 2/25/2015, serving a copy thereof on each of the potential interested parties; and the United States may withdraw its demand for a jury trial pursuant to Rule 38(d), by 4/1/2015. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 2/5/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 0.64 Acre of Land, More or Less, Situate in Logan County, State of West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Christopher Krivonyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.64 Acre of Land, More or Less, Situate in Logan County, State of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. P. Henritze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?