Pendleton v. WV Division of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: |
Ricky Vincent Pendleton |
Defendant: |
Kelli Hinte, Sherrie Snyder, Cheryl Chandler, Michael Shumate, Patrick Janiszewski, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Lisa Boggs |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01903 |
Filed: |
July 16, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Fayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Dwane L. Tinsley |
Presiding Judge: |
John T. Copenhaver |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2019 |
Filing
98
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing (1) the plaintiff's 88 Objections to the Proposed Findings and Recommendation are overruled; (2) the magistrate judge's 87 Proposed Findings and Recommendation are adopted and incorporated in full; (3) the defendants' 73 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss is granted; and(4) this civil action be dismissed and stricken from the docket of the court. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/27/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiff's 47 MOTION for Expedited Relief, 54 MOTION for Expedited and Injunctive Relief, and 57 MOTION for Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/19/2016. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record; magistrate judge) (tmh)
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER the Court adopts and incorporates the 60 Proposed Findings and Recommendation only to the extent it addresses the dismissal of defendants Boggs, Janiszewski, Shumate, and the West Virginia Division of Corrections; the C ourt ORDERS defendants' 23 motion to dismiss the amended complaint granted with respect to defendants Boggs, Janiszewski, Shumate, and otherwise denied, and those three defendants are ORDERED dismissed; inasmuch as the West Virginia Division o f Corrections has been omitted by the plaintiff from his amended complaint, it is also ORDERED dismissed; the court also ORDERS that, to the extent the same filing presents an alternative motion for summary judgment, that motion is denied without pre judice; directing the clerk to terminate the 65 motion for a right to reply, the court having construed the filing as a reply rather than an independent motion for relief; the court further ORDERS this matter re-referred to the magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/31/2016. (cc: plaintiff, all counsel of record, and the magistrate judge) (skh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?