Tulk v. Cavender et al
Plaintiff: Sherry A. Tulk
Defendant: East End Main Street, Charleston Main Streets, Affiliate Organizations, Amy McLaughlin, Mary Beth Hoover, MaryAnne Crickard, Rob Thomas, Mike Pushkin, Mary Jean Davis, Marc Weintraub, Dickinson Gould, Jim Edwards, Lori Brannon, Sarah Halstead, West End Main Street, Josh Dodd, Mesh Design and Development and Ric Cavender
Case Number: 2:2015cv11653
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Dwane L. Tinsley
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing the plaintiff's objections to the Proposed Findings and Recommendations are overruled; the 170 Proposed Findings and Recommendations are, adopted and incorporated in full; defendants' motions to di smiss contained in ECF Nos. 98 , 100 , 104 , 108 , 113 , 115 , 123 , 125 , 127 , 133 , 135 , 137 , 140 , 144 , 146 , 148 , 150 , and 159 are granted; defendants' motions to dismiss contained in ECF Nos. 102 and 106 are denied as moot; plaintiff's claims against Mary Beth Hoover, Megan Bullock, and Affiliate Organizations are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); and this is dismissed with prejudice and stricken from the court's docket. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/3/2020. (cc: counsel of record; plaintiff) (ts)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting the 66 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge; directing that the 23 , 25 , 31 , 35 , 44 , 46 and 57 motions are denied without prejudice; this matter is recommitted to United States Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/13/2017. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record; United States Magistrate Judgw) (taq)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting and incorporating the 9 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge; denying without prejudice the defendants' 7 Motion to dismiss; this matter is recommitted to the magistrate judge under the original reference to take all such further steps and proceedings herein as shall be appropriate. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/27/2016. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record) (taq)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tulk v. Cavender et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry A. Tulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East End Main Street
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Main Streets
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliate Organizations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McLaughlin
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Hoover
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaryAnne Crickard
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Thomas
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pushkin
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jean Davis
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Weintraub
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickinson Gould
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Edwards
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Brannon
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Halstead
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West End Main Street
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Dodd
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesh Design and Development
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ric Cavender
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?