Siders et al v. 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Roy A. Siders and Nancy Siders
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International, American Steel & Wire Co., 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Rust Engineering Company, Guard-Line, United States Steel, LLC, Sundyne Corporation, Blue M, Bucyrus International, Inc., American Gage & Machine Company, Brand Insulations, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Seco/Warwick Corporation, Black & Veatch, United States Steel Corporation, Swindell-Dressler International Company, 4520 Corp., Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., Roper Pump Company, Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc., Cashco, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Trane U.S., Inc., Clyde Union, Inc., Beazer USA, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Lewis Pumps, Jabo Supply Corporation, Mundet Cork, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc., Weil-McLain Company, John Crane, Inc., T&L Supply Co., Carver Pump Company, Flsmidth Dorr-Oliver Eimco, Inc., The Garp Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation, West Virginia Electric Supply Company, McCarls, Inc., Corbesco, Inc., Swindell-Dressler Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Safety First Supply, Sullair Corporation, Smith & Kanzler, Victor Manufacturing & Gasket Co., CBS Corporation, Abex Corporation, Friction Products Division, Viking Pump, Inc., ABB, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Foster Wheeler, L.L.C., Premier Refractories, Inc., The Sager Corporation, Hinchliffe & Keener, Inc., Flsmidth Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Plotkin Brothers Supply, LLP, Wheelabrator Air Pollution Control, Inc., Edward Valves, Inc., Ahlstrom Pumps LLC, Crown, Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc., Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc., Sager Glove Corporation, Adience Company, LP, SVI Corporation, Ametek, Inc., Joy Manufacturing, Inc., Thermo Electric Company, Inc., Gould Electronics, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Genuine Parts Company, Whiting Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Atlas Industries, Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Dana Corporation, Sunbeam Products, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Vimasco Corporation, Simakas Company, Inc., WEMCO Pumps, Metropolitan Insurance Company, Peerless Industries, Inc., Rust Engineering & Construction, Inc., Flowserve U.S. Inc., Fairmont Supply Company, Morgan Engineering Systems, Inc., Robinson Fans, Inc., Columbus McKinnon Corporation, State Electric Supply Company, American Optical Corporation, M. S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc., Trans-pumps, Inc., Power Piping Company, Velan Valve Corporation, Minnotte Contracting Corporation, Catalytic, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, North American Manufacturing Company, Cutler-Hammer, Inc., F. B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh, Thiem Corp., Koppers Co., Inc., Valtek International, United Conveyor Corporation, Eichleay Corporation, McNeil (Ohio) Corporation, Benjamin F. Shaw Company, Mahoning Valley Supply Co., Watson McDaniel Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Beazer, PLC, Flowserve US, Inc., American Standard, Inc., Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc., Kvaerner U.S. Inc., Jerguson Gage and Valve, Team Industrial Services, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Industrial Rubber Products, Amercable Div., The Young Group, Ltd., Appalachian Power Company, Taco, Inc., WMX Technologies, Inc., Wheeling Rubber Products, Inc., A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc., American Electric Power Company, Inc., Coppus Turbines, Alliance Machine Company, Allied Glove Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., WABCO, Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc., Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Haveg Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Crane Company, Inc., The Fairbanks Company, ITE Circuit Breaker Company, Tasco Insulation, Inc., Amdura LLC, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Reliance Motion Control, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Allied Chemical, FMC Corporation, Safety First Industries, Inc., Buffalo Pumps, Inc., E. I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, American Electric Power Service Corporation, McJunkin Redman Corporation, Baker Hughes Incorporated, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Demag Cranes & Components Corp., Union Carbide Corporation, Pangborn Corporation, The William Powell Company, Lindberg, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Durco International and the Duriron Company, Reading Crane and Engineering Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, WTI Rust Holdings, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Flsmidth Salt Lake City, Inc., Townsend & Bottum, Inc., Robbins & Myers, Inc., Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc., Union Pump Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., Elliott Company, Yuba Heat Transfer LLC, USX Corporation, George V. Hamilton, Inc., General Electric Company, Dezurik, Inc., Sunbeam Corporation, Greene Tweed & Co., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., IU North America, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Allied Corporation, Magnetek, Inc., Badger Company, Inc., Clark-Reliance Corporation, Nagle Pumps, Inc., Moyno, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Rockwell Manufacturing Company, DAP Products, Inc., Davy McKee Corporation, The Gage Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Washington Group International, Raytheon Engineers and Constructors, Inc., Research-Cottrell, Inc., UB West Virginia, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., BMI, Inc., Deane Properties Co., Warren Pumps, Inc., Caterpillar Global Mining, LLC, Mueller Steam Specialty, Fluor Corporation, Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, ITE Imperial Co., Cameron International Corporation, Joy Mining Machinery, Gentex Corporation, Westinghouse Airbrake, Eaton Corporation, Surface Combustion, Lift-Tech International, Inc., Keystone Valve Corp., IMO Industries, Inc. and Safety First Supply of Canada, LTD
Case Number: 2:2015cv13278
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2016 Filing 819 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, of receipt on 5/2/2016, of original case file pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered 4/29/2016. (tmh)
April 29, 2016 Filing 818 LETTER to Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, from Clerk, USDC/SDWV dated 4/29/2016, re: transmitting entire case file pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered by the Honorable Thomas E. Johnston 4/29/2016 remanding this case. (tmh)
April 29, 2016 Filing 817 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #816 Memorandum Opinion and Order to counsel of record, any unrepresented party, and Clerk of Court for the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia. (tmh)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 816 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's #14 MOTION to Remand to Circuit Court; remanding this case to the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia; directing the Clerk to remove this matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 4/29/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party; Clerk of Court for the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia) (tmh)
April 29, 2016 Filing 815 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by The Nash Engineering Company for First Discovery Requests of The Nash Engineering Company to Plaintiff (Mroz, Kenneth)
April 29, 2016 Filing 814 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendant ABB, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Response to Request for Production Of Documents and Response to Request For Admissions (Chervenick, David)
April 29, 2016 Filing 813 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs Response to Beazer East, Inc. f/k/a Koppers Company, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admissions and request for Production of Documents (Chervenick, David)
April 29, 2016 Filing 812 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Gentex Corporation Evidencing Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Lindsay, Brian)
April 29, 2016 Filing 811 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Edward Valves, Inc., Flowserve U.S. Inc.(and its Limitorque Brand), Flowserve U.S., Inc.(and its Gestra Brand), Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Bosak, Megan)
April 29, 2016 Filing 810 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. Evidencing Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Lindsay, Brian)
April 29, 2016 Filing 809 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Pangborn Corporation Evidencing Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Lindsay, Brian)
April 29, 2016 Filing 808 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Optical Corporation for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Bosak, Megan)
April 29, 2016 Filing 807 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Amdura LLC for Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Bosak, Megan)
April 29, 2016 Filing 806 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Companys Evidencing Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Lindsay, Brian)
April 29, 2016 Filing 805 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by 4520 Corp., Inc., Benjamin F. Shaw Company for Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Bosak, Megan)
April 29, 2016 Filing 804 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Vimasco Corporation Evidencing Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Lindsay, Brian)
April 29, 2016 Filing 803 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by UB West Virginia, Inc. for Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Bosak, Megan)
April 28, 2016 Filing 802 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs Response to Aurora Pump, Blue M, DeZurik Inc., General Electric Company, Lindberg Corporation, Research-Cottrell and Velan Valves First Set of Interrogatories Request for Admissions and Request for Production of Documents (Chervenick, David)
April 28, 2016 Filing 801 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc. for Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs (Petrina, Joseph)
April 28, 2016 Filing 800 MOTION by J. Tyler Dinsmore, Megan F. Bosak, Frances M. Rollins of Flaherty Sensabaugh Bonasso to Withdraw Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appearance of Counsel)(Dinsmore, J.)
April 28, 2016 Filing 799 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc. for Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admissions of Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc. (Guice, Kelly)
April 28, 2016 Filing 798 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Flowserve U.S. Inc. for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of BW/IP, Inc. and its Wholly Owned Subsidiaries (Mowen, Kelly)
April 28, 2016 Filing 797 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The Young Group, Ltd. Evidencing Service of Defendant The Young Group, Ltd.'s Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (Beeson, Joseph)
April 28, 2016 Filing 796 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Mueller Steam Specialty Evidencing Service of Defendant Mueller Steam Specialty's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (Beeson, Joseph)
April 28, 2016 Filing 795 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Clyde Union, Inc. Evidencing Service of Defendant Clyde Union, Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (Beeson, Joseph)
April 28, 2016 Filing 794 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Evidencing Service of Defendant Sterling Fluid Systesm (USA), LLC's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (Beeson, Joseph)
April 28, 2016 Filing 793 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by FMC Corporation Evidencing Service of Defendant FMC Corporation's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (Beeson, Joseph)
April 27, 2016 Filing 792 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Wheeling Rubber Products, Inc. for Wheeling Rubber Products Inc.'s Discovery to Plaintiff; Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Fraley, J.)
April 27, 2016 Filing 791 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Gage & Machine Company for American Gage & Machine Co.'s Discovery to Plaintiff; Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Fraley, J.)
April 27, 2016 Filing 790 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's First Set of Interrogatories and responses to request for Production of Documents (Chervenick, David)
April 27, 2016 Filing 789 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Eichleay Corporation for Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs (Petrina, Joseph)
April 27, 2016 Filing 788 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc. for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff (Daly, Leo)
April 27, 2016 Filing 787 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by F. B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed toPlaintiff (Daly, Leo)
April 27, 2016 Filing 786 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff (Daly, Leo)
April 27, 2016 Filing 785 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Caterpillar Global Mining, LLC for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs (Daly, Leo)
April 27, 2016 Filing 784 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Minnotte Contracting Corporation for Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs (Petrina, Joseph)
April 27, 2016 Filing 783 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a VIACOM INC.,(as sucessor by merger) for CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hendrickson, David)
April 27, 2016 Filing 782 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas for also known as Guard Line, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 781 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 780 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DAP Products, Inc., k/n/a Mirada Products Co., Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 779 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Warren Pumps, Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 778 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Taco, Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 777 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Carver Pump Company for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 776 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 775 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Trane U.S., Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 774 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Seco/Warwick Corporation for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 773 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cashco, Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 772 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 771 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Dravo Corporation for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 770 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Zurn Industries, LLC for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 769 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 27, 2016 Filing 768 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Greene Tweed & Co. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Hall, Jeffry)
April 26, 2016 Filing 767 JOINT MOTION by Surface Combustion, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders to Enter Order of Dismissal (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Mulhall, James) (Modified on 4/26/2016 to add party filers) (skh).
April 26, 2016 Filing 766 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Eaton Corporation Evidencing Service of Defendant Eaton Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs (Mulhall, James)
April 25, 2016 Filing 765 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants, by Plaintiffs.(Chervenick, David)
April 22, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #752 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #760. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Entry and image removed and correct image re-filed by counsel at entry #760. (taq)
April 22, 2016 Filing 764 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Flowserve U.S. Inc. for Defendant Flowserve Corporation as successor-in-interest to Valtek, Inc.'s Supplemental Interrogatories and Request for Production Issued to Comply With the Medicare Secondary Payer Act and To Inquire as to Medicaid Status (Mowen, Kelly)
April 22, 2016 Filing 763 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Flowserve U.S. Inc. for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of Flowserve Corporation as successor-in-interest to Valtek, Inc. (Mowen, Kelly)
April 22, 2016 Filing 762 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Flowserve U.S. Inc. for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. (Mowen, Kelly)
April 22, 2016 Filing 761 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Flowserve US, Inc. for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of Flowserve US, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation (Mowen, Kelly)
April 22, 2016 Filing 760 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of Pneumo Abex, LLC (Mowen, Kelly)
April 22, 2016 Filing 759 JOINT MOTION by Crown, Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders to Enter Order of Dismissal (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Whisler, Lisa) (Modified on 4/23/2016 to add party filers) (skh).
April 22, 2016 Filing 758 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Milwaukee Valve Company for Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.'s Supplemental Interrogatories and Request for Production Issued to Comply With the Medicare Secondary Payer Act and to Inquire as to Medicaid Status (Droppleman, Margaret)
April 22, 2016 Filing 757 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.'s Supplemental Interrogatories and Request for Production Issued to Comply With the Medicare Secondary Payer Act and To Inquire as to Medicaid Status (Droppleman, Margaret)
April 22, 2016 Filing 756 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation for Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC's Second Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Droppleman, Margaret)
April 22, 2016 Filing 755 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Droppleman, Margaret)
April 22, 2016 Filing 754 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Milwaukee Valve Company for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (Droppleman, Margaret)
April 22, 2016 Filing 753 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by IU North America, Inc., The Gage Company for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of The Gage Company and I.U. North America, Inc. (Droppleman, Margaret)
April 22, 2016 Filing 752 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #760. (Modified on 4/25/2016 to remove image; correct image re-filed by counsel at entry #760. (taq).
April 22, 2016 Filing 751 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Certainteed Corporation for Request for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of CertainTeed Corporation (Droppleman, Margaret)
April 21, 2016 Filing 750 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Tyler Dinsmore, Frances M. Rollins, Megan F. Bosak on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Dinsmore, J.)
April 21, 2016 Filing 749 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by West Virginia Electric Supply Company for West Virginia Electric Supply Company's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs(Petrina, Joseph) (Modified text on 4/25/2016 to conform to file document) (taq).
April 21, 2016 Filing 748 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by State Electric Supply Company for State Electric Supply Company's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified text on 4/25/2016 to conform to filed document)(taq).
April 21, 2016 Filing 747 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by M. S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc. for M. S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc.'s Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified text on 4/25/2016 to conform to filed document)(taq).
April 20, 2016 Filing 746 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs' Statement of Bankruptcy Claims (Chervenick, David)
April 18, 2016 Filing 745 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) (Chervenick, David) (Modified on 4/19/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
April 18, 2016 Filing 744 NOTICE of Designation of At Fault Non-Parties by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Stevenson, Timothy)
April 18, 2016 Filing 743 NOTICE of Designation of At Fault Non-Parties by Clark-Reliance Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Stevenson, Timothy)
April 13, 2016 Filing 742 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Crown, Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc. for Initial Disclosures of Defendant Crown Cork and Seal (Whisler, Lisa) (Modified on 4/14/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
April 12, 2016 Filing 741 NOTICE of Designation of At Fault Non-Parties by Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Stevenson, Timothy)
April 12, 2016 Filing 740 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF AT FAULT NON-PARTIES by Alfa Laval, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cerrone, Shannan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 739 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs' Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(a)(1) (Chervenick, David) (Modified on 4/12/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
April 4, 2016 Filing 738 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Corbesco, Inc. for Evidencing Service of Defendant Corbesco, Inc's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admissions to Plaintiffs (Smallwood, Edward)
March 29, 2016 Filing 737 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company for Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiffs (Banford, Craig)
March 28, 2016 Filing 736 ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIMS by Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc. (Mulhall, James)
March 28, 2016 Filing 735 ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIMS by Eaton Corporation (Mulhall, James)
March 25, 2016 Filing 734 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Duro Dyne Corporation for First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Plaintiff (Negley, Christopher) (Modified text on 3/29/2016 for clarity) (taq).
March 24, 2016 Filing 733 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Joy Technologies, Inc. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (English, Jason)
March 24, 2016 Filing 732 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (English, Jason)
March 24, 2016 Filing 731 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sundyne Corporation of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (English, Jason)
March 24, 2016 Filing 730 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Gardner Denver, Inc. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (English, Jason)
March 24, 2016 Filing 729 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Moyno, Inc. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (James, Lola)
March 24, 2016 Filing 728 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sullair Corporation of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (James, Lola)
March 24, 2016 Filing 727 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Simakas Company, Inc. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (James, Lola)
March 24, 2016 Filing 726 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Robinson Fans, Inc. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (James, Lola)
March 24, 2016 Filing 725 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Robbins & Myers, Inc. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (James, Lola)
March 24, 2016 Filing 724 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Power Piping Company of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (James, Lola)
March 24, 2016 Filing 723 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mahoning Valley Supply Co. of Requests for Admission and Accompanying Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs (James, Lola)
March 21, 2016 Filing 722 JOINT MOTION by United States Steel Corporation, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders to Enter Order of Dismissal (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbogast, Andrew) (Modified on 3/21/2016 to correct party filers) (skh).
March 21, 2016 Filing 721 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation for Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Arbogast, Andrew)
March 18, 2016 Filing 720 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Washington Group International (Geis, Dennis)
March 18, 2016 Filing 719 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Washington Group International.(Geis, Dennis) (Modified on 3/18/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
March 17, 2016 Filing 718 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The William Powell Company for Defendant The William Powell Company's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Documents to Plaintiffs (Durst, Paula)
March 17, 2016 Filing 717 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company for Defendant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Durst, Paula)
March 16, 2016 Filing 716 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Beazer East, Inc., Beazer USA, Inc., Beazer, PLC, Koppers Co., Inc., Thiem Corp. for Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission Directed to Plaintiffs (Leight, Robert)
March 15, 2016 Filing 715 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tasco Insulation, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bell, Brandy)
March 15, 2016 Filing 714 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ABB, Inc. for Defendant ABB, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions to Plaintiff (Grove, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #709 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc. for Research-Cottrell's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Plaintiffs. ERROR: Image contained excess pages 14 and 15. CORRECTION: Removed excess pages and replaced image. (taq)
March 14, 2016 Filing 713 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Velan Valve Corporation for Velan's Requests For Admissions and Related Request For Production (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 712 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Velan Valve Corporation for Velan's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 711 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for First Combined Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Victorson, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 710 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc. for Research-Cottrell's Requests For Admissions and Related Request For Production (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 709 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc. for Research-Cottrell's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 3/16/2016 to remove excess pages and replace image)(taq).
March 14, 2016 Filing 708 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lindberg for Lindberg's Requests for Admissions and Related Request For Production (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 707 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lindberg for Lindberg's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 706 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by General Electric Company for General Electric's Requests for Admissions and Related Request for Production (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 705 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by General Electric Company for General Electric's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 704 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Dezurik, Inc. for Dezurik's Requests For Admissions and Related Request For Production (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 703 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Dezurik, Inc. for Dezurik's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 702 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Blue M for Requests For Admissions and Related Request for Production (Robertson, G.)
March 14, 2016 Filing 701 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Blue M for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Robertson, G.)
March 13, 2016 Filing 700 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Aurora Pump Company for Aurora Pump's Requests For Admissions and Related Request For Production (Robertson, G.)
March 13, 2016 Filing 699 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Aurora Pump Company for Aurora Pump's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Robertson, G.)
March 11, 2016 Filing 698 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Sundyne Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 697 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Sullair Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 696 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Robinson Fans, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 695 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Robbins & Myers, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 694 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Power Piping Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 693 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Mahoning Valley Supply Co. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 692 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Moyno, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 691 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 690 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Joy Technologies, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 11, 2016 Filing 689 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13(d) by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(English, Jason)
March 8, 2016 Filing 688 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Simakas Company, Inc. for Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Silvaggio, Concetta) (Modified on 3/9/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
March 8, 2016 Filing 687 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Simakas Company, Inc.(Silvaggio, Concetta) (Modified on 3/8/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
March 8, 2016 Filing 686 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Simakas Company, Inc. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
March 8, 2016 Filing 685 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Simakas Company, Inc. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
March 4, 2016 Filing 684 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(a)(1) (Chervenick, David) (Modified on 3/7/2016 for clarity and to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
February 29, 2016 Filing 683 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Velan Valve Corporation for Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Thompson, Teresa)
February 26, 2016 Filing 682 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Crown, Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc. (Whisler, Lisa)
February 25, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #681 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sullair Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed Disclosures and replaced image with certificate of service. (taq)
February 25, 2016 Filing 681 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sullair Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Silvaggio, Concetta) (Modified on 2/29/2016 to remove disclosures) (taq).
February 25, 2016 Filing 680 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Sullair Corporation.(Silvaggio, Concetta) (Modified on 2/25/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
February 25, 2016 Filing 679 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sullair Corporation (Silvaggio, Concetta)
February 25, 2016 Filing 678 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Sullair Corporation. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
February 15, 2016 Filing 677 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Renee Whisler on behalf of Crown, Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc. (Whisler, Lisa)
February 5, 2016 Filing 676 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Fiorilli, Mark)
February 1, 2016 Filing 675 NOTICE of Designation of At Fault Non-Parties by Union Carbide Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Kimberly)
January 29, 2016 Filing 674 NOTICE of Designation of At Fault Non-Parties by A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. (Martin, Kimberly)
January 28, 2016 Filing 673 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13D by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Arbogast, Andrew)
January 28, 2016 Filing 672 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault pursuant to West Virginia Code 55-7-13D by United States Steel Corporation (Arbogast, Andrew) (Modified on 1/28/2016 to remove parties filers)(skh)
January 26, 2016 Filing 671 BRIEF by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders in support of #670 MOTION by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Substitution of Parties (Chervenick, David)
January 26, 2016 Filing 670 MOTION by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Substitution of Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Motion to Amend Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Chervenick, David).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 669 DISMISSAL ORDER re: #665 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint as to Defendant Dana Corporation, in its own right and as successor in interest to Smith and Kanzler, Victor Manufacturing & Gasket Company; pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Dana Corporation WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and directing Defendant Dana Corporation removed from the docket for this case. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 1/26/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
January 26, 2016 Filing 668 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13d by American Optical Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosak, Megan)
January 26, 2016 Filing 667 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13d by UB West Virginia, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosak, Megan)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER pursuant to the #652 Joint Notice of Settlement and Dismissal Order, directing that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Honeywell are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; directing the Clerk to remove Defendant Honeywell from the docket for this case. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 1/25/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
January 22, 2016 Filing 665 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT as to defendant Dana Corporation in its own right and as successor to Smith and Kanzler, Victor Manufacturing & Gasket Company without prejudice by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Chervenick, David)
January 20, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #658 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ametek, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Corporate Disclosure attached. Correction: Removed Corporate Disclosure Statement and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 20, 2016 Filing 664 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to WV Code 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindsay, Brian)
January 20, 2016 Filing 663 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to WV Code 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Gentex Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindsay, Brian)
January 20, 2016 Filing 662 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to WV Code 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Pangborn Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindsay, Brian)
January 20, 2016 Filing 661 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to WV Code 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Industrial Holdings Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindsay, Brian)
January 20, 2016 Filing 660 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to WV Code 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Vimasco Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindsay, Brian)
January 20, 2016 Filing 659 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ametek, Inc. for Supplemental Initial. (Vey, Paul)
January 20, 2016 Filing 658 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ametek, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Vey, Paul) (Modified on 1/21/2016 to remove corporate disclosure statement)(taq).
January 19, 2016 Filing 657 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13d by 4520 Corp., Inc., as successor-in-interest to Benjamin F. Shaw Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosak, Megan)
January 19, 2016 Filing 656 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13d by Flowserve U.S. Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Gestra, Inc., and Limitorque, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosak, Megan)
January 19, 2016 Filing 655 SUGGESTION OF DEATH UPON THE RECORD as to Plaintiff Roy A. Siders by General Electric Company (Thompson, Teresa)
January 18, 2016 Filing 654 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY UPON THE RECORD by George V. Hamilton, Inc. as to Geo. V. Hamilton, Inc. (James, Lola)
January 15, 2016 Filing 653 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT as to defendant Dana Companies, LLC by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Chervenick, David)
January 15, 2016 Filing 652 JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL ORDER by Honeywell International, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Falk, Eric) (Modified on 1/16/2016 to add party filers) (skh).
January 15, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #586 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Buffalo Pumps, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed Disclosures and retained certificate of service(s). (taq)
January 15, 2016 Filing 651 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Seco/Warwick Corporation (Hall, Jeffry)
January 15, 2016 Filing 650 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peerless Industries, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Harman, Anne)
January 15, 2016 Filing 649 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Peerless Industries, Inc. (Harman, Anne)
January 15, 2016 Filing 648 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Peerless Industries, Inc. (Harman, Anne)
January 15, 2016 Filing 647 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne D. Harman on behalf of Peerless Industries, Inc. (Harman, Anne)
January 14, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #542 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service) (taq)
January 14, 2016 Filing 646 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by IU North America, Inc., The Gage Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Droppleman, Margaret) (Modified on 1/19/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 14, 2016 Filing 645 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially At Fault Made Pursuant To W. Va. Code 55-7-13d by IU North America, Inc., The Gage Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Manufacturers of Asbestos and Asbestos Containing Products)(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 14, 2016 Filing 644 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants IU North America, Inc., The Gage Company (Droppleman, Margaret)
January 14, 2016 Filing 643 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by IU North America, Inc., The Gage Company.(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 14, 2016 Filing 642 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morgan Engineering Systems, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 641 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Gorman-Rupp Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 640 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gould Electronics, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 639 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Weil-McLain Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 638 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McJunkin Redman Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 637 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weil-McLain Company.(Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 636 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gould Electronics, Inc.(Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 635 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Morgan Engineering Systems, Inc.(Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 634 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Gorman-Rupp Company.(Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 633 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McJunkin Redman Corporation.(Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 632 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Certainteed Corporation for Defendant CertainTeed Corporation's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Droppleman, Margaret) (Modified on 1/19/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 14, 2016 Filing 631 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially At Fault Made Pursuant To W. Va. Code 55-7-13d by Certainteed Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Manufacturers of Asbestos and Asbestos Containing Products)(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 14, 2016 Filing 630 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Certainteed Corporation (Droppleman, Margaret)
January 14, 2016 Filing 629 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Certainteed Corporation.(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 14, 2016 Filing 628 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Weil-McLain Company (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 627 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 626 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Gould Electronics, Inc. (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 625 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Morgan Engineering Systems, Inc. (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 624 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McJunkin Redman Corporation (Roma, Jason)
January 14, 2016 Filing 623 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alliance Machine Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Harman, Anne)
January 14, 2016 Filing 622 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Alliance Machine Company (Harman, Anne)
January 14, 2016 Filing 621 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Alliance Machine Company.(Harman, Anne)
January 14, 2016 Filing 620 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne D. Harman on behalf of Alliance Machine Company. (Harman, Anne)
January 13, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #590 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plastics Engineering Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 13, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #589 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Fairbanks Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 13, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #588 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Catalytic, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 13, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #587 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Viking Pump, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 13, 2016 Filing 619 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures of Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation (Droppleman, Margaret) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 618 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially At Fault Made Pursuant To W. Va. Code 55-7-13d by Pneumo Abex Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Manufacturers of Asbestos and Asbestos Containing Products)(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 13, 2016 Filing 617 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation (Droppleman, Margaret)
January 13, 2016 Filing 616 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 13, 2016 Filing 615 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Seco/Warwick Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 614 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 613 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 612 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 611 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Carver Pump Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 610 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Zurn Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 609 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Warren Pumps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 608 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Trane U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 607 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Taco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 606 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 605 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 604 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Greene Tweed & Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 603 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Dravo Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 602 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by Cashco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 601 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES POTENTIALLY AT FAULT PURSUANT TO 55-7-13D(2) OF WEST VIRGINIA'S MODIFIED COMPARATIVE FAULT STATUTE by DAP Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Jeffry)
January 13, 2016 Filing 600 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault in This Matter Pursuant to 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Durst, Paula)
January 13, 2016 Filing 599 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault in this Matter Pursuant to 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by The William Powell Company (Attachments #1 Exhibit A)(Durst, Paula)
January 13, 2016 Filing 598 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault in this Matter Pursuant to 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Kvaerner U.S. Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Durst, Paula)
January 13, 2016 Filing 597 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc. for Rule 26 Disclosures (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 596 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Minnotte Contracting Corporation for Rule 26 Disclosures (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 595 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Reading Crane and Engineering Company for Rule 26 Disclosures (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 594 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by M. S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc. for Rule 26 Disclosures (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 593 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Eichleay Corporation for Rule 26 Disclosures (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 592 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by State Electric Supply Company for Rule 26 Disclosures (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 591 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by West Virginia Electric Supply Company for Rule 26 Disclosures (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 13, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #425 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roper Pump Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 13, 2016 Filing 590 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plastics Engineering Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mitchell, Susan) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 589 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Fairbanks Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mitchell, Susan) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 588 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Catalytic, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mitchell, Susan) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to remove disclosures) (taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 587 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Viking Pump, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mitchell, Susan) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 586 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Buffalo Pumps, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mitchell, Susan) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to remove disclosures) (taq).
January 13, 2016 Filing 585 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Plastics Engineering Company (Mitchell, Susan)
January 13, 2016 Filing 584 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Fairbanks Company (Mitchell, Susan)
January 13, 2016 Filing 583 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Catalytic, Inc. (Mitchell, Susan)
January 13, 2016 Filing 582 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. (Mitchell, Susan)
January 13, 2016 Filing 581 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Buffalo Pumps, Inc. (Mitchell, Susan)
January 13, 2016 Filing 580 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth S. Mroz, John Argento, Stephen R. Mlinac on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Mroz, Kenneth)
January 13, 2016 Filing 579 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to W. Va. Code Section 55-7-13(d) by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Beeson, Joseph)
January 13, 2016 Filing 578 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to W. Va. Code Section 55-7-13(d) by FMC Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Beeson, Joseph)
January 13, 2016 Filing 577 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to W. Va. Code Section 55-7-13(d) by Mueller Steam Specialty (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Beeson, Joseph)
January 13, 2016 Filing 576 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to W. Va. Code Section 55-7-13(d) by Clyde Union, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Beeson, Joseph)
January 13, 2016 Filing 575 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to W. Va. Code Section 55-7-13(d) by The Young Group, Ltd. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Beeson, Joseph)
January 12, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #544 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Honeywell International, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 12, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #543 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Nash Engineering Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 12, 2016 Filing 574 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. for Certificate of Service to Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures of Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Droppleman, Margaret) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 12, 2016 Filing 573 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially At Fault Made Pursuant To W. Va. Code 55-7-13d by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Manufacturers of Asbestos and Asbestos Containing Products)(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 12, 2016 Filing 572 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Droppleman, Margaret)
January 12, 2016 Filing 571 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Rockwell Automation, Inc.(Droppleman, Margaret)
January 12, 2016 Filing 570 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundyne Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures(James, Lola)
January 12, 2016 Filing 569 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Sundyne Corporation.(James, Lola) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 568 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sundyne Corporation (James, Lola)
January 12, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #564 and #565 Petitions by Allied Glove Corporation and Flsmidth Inc. for Disclosure. ERROR: Incorrect event selected and incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Images removed; certificates of service filed using the event Certificate of Service for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, entries #566 and #567. (skh)
January 12, 2016 Filing 567 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flsmidth Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mlinac, Stephen)
January 12, 2016 Filing 566 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allied Glove Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mlinac, Stephen)
January 12, 2016 Filing 565 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #567. (Modified on 1/12/2016 to remove image; document correctly filed at entry #567) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 564 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #566. (Modified on 1/12/2016 to remove image; document correctly filed at entry #566) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 563 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robbins & Myers, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 562 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Robbins & Myers, Inc.(English, Jason) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 561 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Robbins & Myers, Inc. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 560 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahoning Valley Supply Co. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 559 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Mahoning Valley Supply Co.(English, Jason) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 558 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Mahoning Valley Supply Co. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 557 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Piping Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 556 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Power Piping Company.(English, Jason) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 555 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Power Piping Company (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 554 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moyno, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 553 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Moyno, Inc.(English, Jason) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 552 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Moyno, Inc. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 551 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robinson Fans, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 550 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by Robinson Fans, Inc.(English, Jason) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 12, 2016 Filing 549 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Robinson Fans, Inc. (English, Jason)
January 12, 2016 Filing 548 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheelabrator Air Pollution Control, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Singley, David)
January 12, 2016 Filing 547 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WTI Rust Holdings, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Singley, David)
January 12, 2016 Filing 546 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rust Engineering & Construction, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Singley, David)
January 12, 2016 Filing 545 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brand Insulations, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Singley, David)
January 12, 2016 Filing 544 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Honeywell International, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mroz, Kenneth) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to remove disclosures. (taq).
January 12, 2016 Filing 543 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Nash Engineering Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mroz, Kenneth) (Modified on 1/15/2016 to remove disclosures) (taq).
January 12, 2016 Filing 542 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. McGeary, Hunter) (Modified on 1/14/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 12, 2016 Filing 541 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hunter A. McGeary, Jr on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGeary, Hunter)
January 12, 2016 Filing 540 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Sundyne Corporation. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
January 12, 2016 Filing 539 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Robbins & Myers, Inc. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
January 12, 2016 Filing 538 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Mahoning Valley Supply Co. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
January 12, 2016 Filing 537 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Power Piping Company. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
January 12, 2016 Filing 536 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Moyno, Inc. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
January 12, 2016 Filing 535 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Robinson Fans, Inc. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
January 12, 2016 Filing 534 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flsmidth Dorr-Oliver Eimco, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Schaper, Joseph)
January 12, 2016 Filing 533 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safety First Industries, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Schaper, Joseph)
January 11, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #434 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genuine Parts Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 11, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #431 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McCarl's, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 11, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #424 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premier Refractories, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 11, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #399 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howden North America, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. ERROR: Disclosures attached. CORRECTION: Removed disclosures and retained certificate of service. (taq)
January 11, 2016 Filing 532 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baker Hughes Incorporated(as successor-in-interest to Wemco Pumps) for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Keating, Philip)
January 11, 2016 Filing 531 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baker Hughes Incorporated (as successor-in-interest to Lewis Pumps) for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Keating, Philip)
January 11, 2016 Filing 530 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Chervenick, David)
January 11, 2016 Filing 529 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flsmidth Salt Lake City, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Keating, Philip)
January 11, 2016 Filing 528 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Durst, Paula)
January 11, 2016 Filing 527 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The William Powell Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Durst, Paula)
January 11, 2016 Filing 526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kvaerner U.S. Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Durst, Paula)
January 11, 2016 Filing 525 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 524 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 523 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Parker-Hannifin Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bosak, David)
January 11, 2016 Filing 522 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USX Corporation, United States Steel Corporation, United States Steel, LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bosak, David)
January 11, 2016 Filing 521 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keystone Valve Corp. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Luxton, Steven)
January 11, 2016 Filing 520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ITT Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Luxton, Steven)
January 11, 2016 Filing 519 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grinnell LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Luxton, Steven)
January 11, 2016 Filing 518 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elliott Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Luxton, Steven)
January 11, 2016 Filing 517 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially At Fault Made Pursuant to W. Va. Code 55-17-13c by Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Manufacturers of Asbestos and Asbestos Containing Products)(Mowen, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 516 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc. for Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Mowen, Kelly) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 515 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc. (Mowen, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 514 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Clark-Reliance Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Stevenson, Timothy) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 513 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc.(Mowen, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 512 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Stevenson, Timothy) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 511 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Sager Glove Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Stevenson, Timothy) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 510 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Grinnell LLC (Luxton, Steven)
January 11, 2016 Filing 509 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Spirax Sarco, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Stevenson, Timothy) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 508 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valtek International for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mowen, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 507 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Durco International and the Duriron Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mowen, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 506 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Grinnell LLC.(Luxton, Steven) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 505 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flowserve US, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mowen, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 504 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flowserve U.S. Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mowen, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 503 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Watson McDaniel Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Geis, Dennis)
January 11, 2016 Filing 502 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Industrial Rubber Products for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Geis, Dennis)
January 11, 2016 Filing 501 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Milwaukee Valve Company for Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Mowen, Kelly) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert Event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 500 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Team Industrial Services, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Johnson, Diana)
January 11, 2016 Filing 499 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cameron International Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Johnson, Diana)
January 11, 2016 Filing 498 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Johnson, Diana)
January 11, 2016 Filing 497 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 496 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 495 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ahlstrom Pumps LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Johnson, Diana)
January 11, 2016 Filing 494 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Carver Pump Company (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 493 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 492 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 491 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Union Carbide Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Martin, Kimberly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carver Pump Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 489 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gardner Denver, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (James, Lola)
January 11, 2016 Filing 488 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Victorson, Michael)
January 11, 2016 Filing 487 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seco/Warwick Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 486 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (James, Lola)
January 11, 2016 Filing 485 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joy Technologies, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (James, Lola)
January 11, 2016 Filing 484 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Seco/Warwick Corporation.(Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 483 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc.(Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 482 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Duro Dyne Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Negley, Christopher)
January 11, 2016 Filing 481 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas.(Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 480 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crane Company, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Fraley, J.)
January 11, 2016 Filing 479 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairmont Supply Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Victorson, Michael)
January 11, 2016 Filing 478 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Carver Pump Company.(Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 477 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Lindsay, Brian)
January 11, 2016 Filing 476 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gentex Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Lindsay, Brian)
January 11, 2016 Filing 475 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Gage & Machine Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Fraley, J.)
January 11, 2016 Filing 474 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pangborn Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Lindsay, Brian)
January 11, 2016 Filing 473 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Industrial Holdings Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Lindsay, Brian)
January 11, 2016 Filing 472 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 471 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cashco, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 470 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vimasco Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Lindsay, Brian)
January 11, 2016 Filing 469 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cashco, Inc.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 468 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 467 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zurn Industries, LLC for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Requests. (Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to conform to filed document and convert event) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 466 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 465 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Warren Pumps, Inc. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Conveyor Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Sopher, Jeanne)
January 11, 2016 Filing 463 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Warren Pumps, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 462 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps, Inc.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 461 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Trane U.S., Inc. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 460 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trane U.S., Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 459 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Trane U.S., Inc.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 458 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Taco, Inc. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 457 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taco, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 456 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Taco, Inc.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 455 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 454 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Blue M for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 453 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Beeson, Joseph)
January 11, 2016 Filing 452 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sunbeam Products, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 451 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Sunbeam Products, Inc.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 450 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FMC Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Beeson, Joseph)
January 11, 2016 Filing 449 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 448 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ingersoll-Rand Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 447 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 446 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Greene Tweed & Co. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 445 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greene Tweed & Co. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 444 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Greene Tweed & Co.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 443 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Dravo Corporation (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 442 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dravo Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 441 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dravo Corporation.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand)(skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 440 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant DAP Products, Inc. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 439 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lindberg for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 438 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DAP Products, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hall, Jeffry)
January 11, 2016 Filing 437 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by DAP Products, Inc.(Hall, Jeffry) (Modified on 1/11/2016 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
January 11, 2016 Filing 436 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Demag Cranes & Components Corp. for Initial Disclosures of Demag Cranes & Components Corp. (Whitson, Keith) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Velan Valve Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 434 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genuine Parts Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hewitt, Patrick) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 433 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mine Safety Appliances Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Banford, Craig)
January 11, 2016 Filing 432 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Demag Cranes & Components Corp.(Whitson, Keith)
January 11, 2016 Filing 431 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McCarls, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Orszulak, Joseph) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 430 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thermo Electric Company, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Olszewski, Edmund)
January 11, 2016 Filing 429 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Guice, Kelly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 428 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Fluor Constructors International, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Muldoon, Lori) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 427 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Muldoon, Lori) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 426 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Fluor Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Muldoon, Lori) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 425 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roper Pump Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Orszulak, Joseph) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 424 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premier Refractories, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Orszulak, Joseph) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to remove disclosures)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 423 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by General Electric Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 422 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Lafferre, Luke)
January 11, 2016 Filing 421 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by John Crane, Inc. for Rule 26 Initial Disclosure (Anetakis, George) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 420 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 419 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Swindell-Dressler International Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 418 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Goulds Pumps, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 417 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by F. B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 416 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 415 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International, Inc., Caterpillar Global Mining, LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 414 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF BONA FIDE DEFENSE by Robert D. Leidigh, Leo Gerard Daly on behalf of Swindell-Dressler International Company. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 413 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF BONA FIDE DEFENSE by Robert D. Leidigh, Leo Gerard Daly on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 412 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF BONA FIDE DEFENSE by Robert D. Leidigh, Leo Gerard Daly on behalf of F. B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 411 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF BONA FIDE DEFENSE by Robert D. Leidigh , Leo Gerard Daly on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 410 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF BONA FIDE DEFENSE by Robert D. Leidigh, Leo Gerard Daly on behalf of Bucyrus International, Inc., Caterpillar Global Mining, LLC. (Leidigh, Robert)
January 11, 2016 Filing 409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheeling Rubber Products, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Fraley, J.)
January 11, 2016 Filing 408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Dezurik, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 407 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amdura LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Jack, Justin)
January 11, 2016 Filing 406 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Aurora Pump Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 405 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Surface Combustion for Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Mulhall, James) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc. for Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Mulhall, James) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 403 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CBS Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hendrickson, David)
January 11, 2016 Filing 402 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Eaton Corporation for Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Mulhall, James) (Modified on 1/13/2016 (to convert event to Rule 26 Document)taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 401 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Martin, Kimberly)
January 11, 2016 Filing 400 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Optical Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bosak, Megan)
January 11, 2016 Filing 399 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howden North America, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hewitt, Patrick) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to remove disclosures) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 398 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UB West Virginia, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bosak, Megan)
January 11, 2016 Filing 397 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corbesco, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Smallwood, Edward)
January 11, 2016 Filing 396 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ABB, Inc. for Defendant ABB, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure (Grove, Jeffrey) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 395 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Fowler, Stephen) (Modified on 1/13/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 11, 2016 Filing 394 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nagle Pumps, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Fiorilli, Mark)
January 11, 2016 Filing 393 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hinchliffe & Keener, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Fiorilli, Mark)
January 11, 2016 Filing 392 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Fiorilli, Mark)
January 8, 2016 Filing 391 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13c by Flowserve US, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation's Notice of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13c)(Mowen, Kelly)
January 8, 2016 Filing 390 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. (Mowen, Kelly)
January 8, 2016 Filing 389 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Flowserve US, Inc.(Mowen, Kelly)
January 8, 2016 Filing 388 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Milwaukee Valve Company for Notice of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault(Mowen, Kelly) (Modified text on 1/12/2016 to conform to filed document)(taq).
January 8, 2016 Filing 387 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Alfa Laval, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Cerrone, Shannan) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document)(taq).
January 8, 2016 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Armstrong International, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Cerrone, Shannan) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 8, 2016 Filing 385 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by North American Manufacturing Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Cerrone, Shannan) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 8, 2016 Filing 384 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plotkin Brothers Supply, LLP for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Cerrone, Shannan) (Modified on 1/12/2016 to convert event to Rule 26 Document) (taq).
January 8, 2016 Filing 383 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Fraley, J.)
January 8, 2016 Filing 382 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 4520 Corp., Inc., Benjamin F. Shaw Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bosak, Megan)
January 8, 2016 Filing 381 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coppus Turbines for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Wood, Jenna)
January 8, 2016 Filing 380 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Columbus McKinnon Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Wood, Jenna)
January 8, 2016 Filing 379 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward Valves, Inc., Flowserve U.S. Inc.(as successor to), Flowserve U.S. Inc.(and its Limitorque Brand), Flowserve U.S., Inc.(and its Gestra Brand), Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bosak, Megan)
January 7, 2016 Filing 378 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13C by Valtek International (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Flowserve Corporation as successor-in-interest to Valtek, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13C)(Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 377 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13C by Durco International and the Duriron Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13C)(Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 376 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13C by Flowserve U.S. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and its Wholly Owned Subsidiaries' Notice of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Made Pursuant to W.Va. Code 55-7-13C)(Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 375 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Valtek International (Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 374 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Valtek International.(Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 373 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Durco International and the Duriron Company (Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 372 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Durco International and the Duriron Company.(Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 371 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Flowserve U.S. Inc. (Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 370 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Flowserve U.S. Inc.(Mowen, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 369 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Young Group, Ltd. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Beeson, Joseph)
January 7, 2016 Filing 368 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mueller Steam Specialty for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Beeson, Joseph)
January 7, 2016 Filing 367 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clyde Union, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Beeson, Joseph)
January 7, 2016 Filing 366 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Wood, Jenna)
January 7, 2016 Filing 365 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbus McKinnon Corporation.(Wood, Jenna)
January 6, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially At Fault Made Pursuant to W. Va. Code 55-17-13c by Milwaukee Valve Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - List of Non-Parties)(Mowen, Kelly)
January 6, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Reading Crane and Engineering Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wrabley, Christian)
January 6, 2016 Filing 362 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to WV Code 55-7-13(d) by IMO Industries, Inc. (Falk, Eric)
January 6, 2016 Filing 361 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to WV Code 55-7-13(d) by Riley Power, Inc. (Falk, Eric)
January 5, 2016 Filing 360 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company (Mowen, Kelly)
January 5, 2016 Filing 359 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Milwaukee Valve Company.(Mowen, Kelly)
January 5, 2016 Filing 358 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES WHOLLY OR PARTIALLY AT FAULT by Eaton Corporation (Mulhall, James)
January 5, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES WHOLLY OR PARTIALLY AT FAULT by Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc. (Mulhall, James)
January 5, 2016 Filing 356 ANSWER by Eaton Corporation to Cross Claims (Mulhall, James)
January 5, 2016 Filing 355 ANSWER by Surface Combustion to Cross Claims (Mulhall, James)
January 5, 2016 Filing 354 AMENDED ANSWER by Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc. to Cross Claims (Mulhall, James)
January 5, 2016 Filing 353 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Riley Power, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Falk, Eric)
January 5, 2016 Filing 352 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IMO Industries, Inc. for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Falk, Eric)
January 4, 2016 Filing 351 NOTICE of Non-Parties Wholly or Partially at Fault Pursuant to W. Va. Code 55-7-13d by ABB, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Grove, Jeffrey)
December 29, 2015 Filing 350 LETTER to Clerk of Court, from David K. Hendrickson dated 12/28/2015, re: filing of #349 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by CBS Corporation and service to counsel under "2:15-cv-13278 Notice has been delivered by other means to" listed herein. (Attachment: #1 Notice) (taq)
December 28, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault Pursuant to 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by CBS Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hendrickson, David)
December 22, 2015 Filing 348 ANSWER by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company to All Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted.(Durst, Paula)
December 22, 2015 Filing 347 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company (Durst, Paula)
December 22, 2015 Filing 346 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durst, Paula) (Modified on 12/22/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
December 22, 2015 Filing 345 ANSWER by Kvaerner U.S. Inc. to All Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted.(Durst, Paula)
December 22, 2015 Filing 344 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Kvaerner U.S. Inc. (Durst, Paula)
December 22, 2015 Filing 343 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kvaerner U.S. Inc. and Answer to All Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durst, Paula) (Modified on 12/22/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
December 22, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault In This Matter Pursuant to Section 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Velan Valve Corporation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Teresa)
December 22, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault In This Matter Pursuant to Section 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Teresa)
December 22, 2015 Filing 340 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault In This Matter Pursuant to Section 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Lindberg (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Teresa)
December 22, 2015 Filing 339 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault In This Matter Pursuant to Section 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by General Electric Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Teresa)
December 22, 2015 Filing 338 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault In This Matter Pursuant to Section 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Dezurik, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Teresa)
December 22, 2015 Filing 337 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault In This Matter Pursuant to Section 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Blue M (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Teresa)
December 22, 2015 Filing 336 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault In This Matter Pursuant to Section 55-7-13d(2) of West Virginia's Modified Comparative Fault Statute by Aurora Pump Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Teresa)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 DISMISSAL ORDER granting the #332 JOINT MOTION to Enter Order of Dismissal; pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), directing that Defendant Magnetek, Inc. is DISMISSED from this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE; directing Defendant Magnetek, Inc. removed from the docket for this case. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/22/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
December 22, 2015 Filing 334 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Coppus Turbines (Wood, Jenna)
December 22, 2015 Filing 333 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coppus Turbines.(Wood, Jenna) (Modified on 12/22/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
December 18, 2015 Filing 332 JOINT MOTION by Magnetek, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders to Enter Order of Dismissal (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Zeszutek, C.) (Modified on 12/18/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER re: #152 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT as to defendant Jabo Supply Corporation by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #153 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT as to defendant Atlas Industries, Inc. by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and #154 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to defendant SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., f/k/a Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc., f/k/a The Marley Cooling Tower Company by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; dismissing without prejudice Defendants Jabo Supply Corporation, Atlas Industries, Inc., and SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., f/k/a Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc., f/k/a The Marley Cooling Tower Company from this action; directing the Clerk to remove these Defendants from the docket for this case. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/18/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 DISMISSAL ORDER granting the parties' #281 JOINT MOTION to Enter Order of Dismissal; directing that Defendant Bechtel Corporation is dismissed without prejudice; directing the Clerk to remove Defendant Bechtel Corporation from the docket for this case. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/18/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/28/2015 is canceled. Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 2/20/2016. Discovery requests to be completed by 5/2/2016. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 4/18/2016, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 5/16/2016, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 6/1/2016. Discovery to close by 06/15/2016. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 7/5/2016, with responses due by 7/19/2016 and replies due by 7/26/2016. Settlement Meeting to be held by 9/6/2016. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/12/2016, with responses due by 9/19/2016. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 9/9/2016, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2016 at 01:30 PM in Charleston before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Jury Instructions and Voir Dire by 10/18/2016. Final Settlement Conference at 01:30 PM on 10/14/2016 in Charleston. Jury Trial set for 10/25/2016 at 09:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/17/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
December 17, 2015 Filing 328 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jenna Perkins Wood on behalf of Coppus Turbines. (Wood, Jenna)
December 17, 2015 Filing 327 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jenna Perkins Wood on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Wood, Jenna)
December 17, 2015 Filing 326 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Jenna Perkins Wood updating her name to Jenna H. Perkins on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Coppus Turbines. (Wood, Jenna)
December 15, 2015 Filing 325 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. (Martin, Kimberly)
December 15, 2015 Filing 324 ANSWER by The William Powell Company to all Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted.(Durst, Paula)
December 15, 2015 Filing 323 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The William Powell Company (Durst, Paula)
December 15, 2015 Filing 322 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The William Powell Company. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durst, Paula) (Modified on 12/15/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
December 15, 2015 Filing 321 AMENDED SHORT FORM ANSWER to #138 Answer to Complaint by State Electric Supply Company (Petrina, Joseph)
December 15, 2015 Filing 320 AMENDED SHORT FORM ANSWER to #139 Answer to Complaint by M. S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc. (Petrina, Joseph)
December 15, 2015 Filing 319 AMENDED SHORT FORM ANSWER to #135 Answer to Complaint by Eichleay Corporation (Petrina, Joseph)
December 15, 2015 Filing 318 AMENDED SHORT FORM ANSWER to #134 Answer to Complaint by Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc. (Petrina, Joseph)
December 15, 2015 Filing 317 AMENDED SHORT FORM ANSWER to #136 Answer to Complaint by West Virginia Electric Supply Company (Petrina, Joseph)
December 15, 2015 Filing 316 AMENDED SHORT FORM ANSWER to #137 Answer to Complaint by Minnotte Contracting Corporation (Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 12/15/2015 to correct link to #137 answer) (skh).
December 14, 2015 Filing 315 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by General Electric Company, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders. (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 12/14/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
December 9, 2015 Filing 314 ANSWER by Pangborn Corporation to All Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 313 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Pangborn Corporation.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 312 ANSWER by Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. to All Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 311 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 310 ANSWER by Gentex Corporation to All Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 309 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Gentex Corporation.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 308 ANSWER by Industrial Holdings Corporation to All Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 307 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 306 ANSWER by Vimasco Corporation to all Cross-Claims Asserted or to be Asserted.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 305 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Vimasco Corporation.(Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 304 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Fluor Constructors International, Inc. (Muldoon, Lori)
December 9, 2015 Filing 303 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Muldoon, Lori)
December 9, 2015 Filing 302 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Fluor Corporation (Muldoon, Lori)
December 9, 2015 Filing 301 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Pangborn Corporation (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 300 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Gentex Corporation (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 299 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 298 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Industrial Holdings Corporation (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 297 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Vimasco Corporation (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Lindsay, Robert H. Sweeney, Jr. on behalf of Pangborn Corporation. (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 295 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Lindsay, Robert H. Sweeney, Jr. on behalf of Gentex Corporation. (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 294 NOTICE OF AENTRY OF PPEARANCE by Brian S. Lindsay, Robert H. Sweeney, Jr., Charles K. Gould on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 293 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Lindsay, Robert H. Sweeney, Jr. on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 292 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Lindsay, Robert H. Sweeney, Jr., Charles K. Gould on behalf of Vimasco Corporation. (Lindsay, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 291 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
December 9, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc., in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Joy Mining Machinery, and its subsidiary T&L Supply Co. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
December 9, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Concetta A. Silvaggio on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Silvaggio, Concetta)
December 8, 2015 Filing 288 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Demag Cranes & Components Corp. (Whitson, Keith)
December 4, 2015 Filing 287 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company (Banford, Craig)
December 4, 2015 Filing 286 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Banford, Craig) (Modified on 12/4/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER pursuant to the #274 Proposed Stipulation and Order for Substitution of Counsel, granting said motion; directing that J. Tyler Dinsmore and the law firm of Flaherty Sensabaugh Bonasso PLLC are substituted as counsel of record for Defendant Amdura LLC in this matter; directing that Steptoe & Johnson PLLC are withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant Amdura LLC in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/3/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
December 3, 2015 Filing 284 ANSWER by UB West Virginia, Inc. to All Cross-Claims Asserted or Which May Hereafter Be Asserted.(Bosak, Megan)
December 3, 2015 Filing 283 ANSWER by Flowserve U.S. Inc., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Gestra, Inc., and Limitorque, Inc., to All Cross-Claims Asserted or Which May Hereafter Be Asserted(Bosak, Megan)
December 3, 2015 Filing 282 ANSWER by 4520 Corp., Inc., Benjamin F. Shaw Company to All Cross-Claims Asserted or Which May Hereafter Be Asserted.(Bosak, Megan)
December 3, 2015 Filing 281 JOINT MOTION by Bechtel Corporation, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders to Enter Order of Dismissal (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Victorson, Michael) (Modified on 12/3/2015 to add party filers)(skh).
December 3, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Keith E. Whitson on behalf of Demag Cranes & Components Corp. (Whitson, Keith)
December 2, 2015 Filing 279 ANSWER by Surface Combustion to Cross Claims (Mulhall, James)
December 2, 2015 Filing 278 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Robert L. Bays requesting removal from the Court's service list on behalf of Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc. (Bays, Robert)
December 2, 2015 Filing 277 ANSWER by Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc. to Cross Claims(Mulhall, James)
December 2, 2015 Filing 276 ANSWER by Eaton Corporation to Cross Claims (Mulhall, James)
December 1, 2015 Filing 275 ANSWER to All Cross-Claims Asserted or Which May Hereafter be Asserted by Amdura LLC.(Jack, Justin)
December 1, 2015 Filing 274 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Order for Substitution of Counsel by Amdura LLC (Bosak, Megan)
December 1, 2015 Filing 273 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc. (Guice, Kelly)
December 1, 2015 Filing 272 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.(James, Lola) (Modified on 12/1/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
December 1, 2015 Filing 271 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (James, Lola)
November 30, 2015 Filing 270 BRIEF by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders in opposition to #227 MOTION by ABB, Inc. for Joinder in #61 MOTION by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company to Dismiss Short Form Complaint, #62 Memorandum In Support (Chervenick, David)
November 30, 2015 Filing 269 BRIEF by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders in opposition to #184 MOTION by Roper Pump Company to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint (Chervenick, David)
November 30, 2015 Filing 268 BRIEF by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders in opposition to #188 MOTION by McCarls, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint (Chervenick, David)
November 30, 2015 Filing 267 BRIEF by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders in opposition to #181 MOTION Premier Refractories, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint (Chervenick, David) (Modified on 11/30/2015 to remove link to #183 memorandum) (skh).
November 25, 2015 Filing 266 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Clark-Reliance Corporation, Jerguson Gage and Valve (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 25, 2015 Filing 265 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 25, 2015 Filing 264 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Copes-Vulcan, Inc. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 25, 2015 Filing 263 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, Cross-Claims and Answer to Cross-Claims by Clark-Reliance Corporation, Jerguson Gage and Valve.(Stevenson, Timothy)
November 25, 2015 Filing 262 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, Cross-Claims and Answer to Cross-Claims by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.(Stevenson, Timothy)
November 25, 2015 Filing 261 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, Cross-Claims and Answer to Cross-Claims by Copes-Vulcan, Inc.(Stevenson, Timothy)
November 25, 2015 Filing 260 ANSWER TO #1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Joy Technologies, Inc.(James, Lola) (Modified on 11/26/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
November 25, 2015 Filing 259 ANSWER TO #1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Gardner Denver, Inc.(James, Lola) (Modified on 11/26/2015 to add link to #1 short form complaint and to add jury demand) (skh).
November 25, 2015 Filing 258 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Joy Technologies, Inc. (James, Lola)
November 25, 2015 Filing 257 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. (James, Lola)
November 25, 2015 Filing 256 ANSWER to #245 Cross-Claim by Clyde Union, Inc. (Beeson, Joseph)
November 25, 2015 Filing 255 ANSWER to #245 Cross-Claim by Mueller Steam Specialty (Beeson, Joseph)
November 25, 2015 Filing 254 ANSWER to #245 Cross-Claim by The Young Group, Ltd. (Beeson, Joseph)
November 25, 2015 Filing 253 ANSWER to #245 Cross-Claim by FMC Corporation (Beeson, Joseph)
November 25, 2015 Filing 252 ANSWER to #245 Cross-Claim by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) (Beeson, Joseph)
November 24, 2015 Filing 251 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT to 11/27/2015 by Clark-Reliance Corporation, Jerguson Gage and Valve, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Stevenson, Timothy) (Modified on 11/25/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 24, 2015 Filing 250 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT to 11/27/2015 by Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Stevenson, Timothy) (Modified on 11/25/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 24, 2015 Filing 249 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT to 11/27/2015 by Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Stevenson, Timothy) (Modified on 11/25/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 24, 2015 Filing 248 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Robert Stevenson, Edmund L. Olszewski on behalf of Clark-Reliance Corporation, Jerguson Gage and Valve. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 24, 2015 Filing 247 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Robert Stevenson, Edmund L. Olszewski on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 24, 2015 Filing 246 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Robert Stevenson, Edmund L. Olszewski on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Inc. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 24, 2015 Filing 245 AMENDED ANSWER by ABB, Inc. to #78 Answer to Short Form Complaint by ABB, Inc. and Answer to all Crossclaims and Crossclaim Against all Defendants. (Grove, Jeffrey) (Modified on 11/25/2015 to add link to #78 answer) (skh).
November 24, 2015 Filing 244 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safety First Industries, Inc. with Jury Demand.(Schaper, Joseph) (Modified on 11/25/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 24, 2015 Filing 243 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Flsmidth Dorr-Oliver Eimco, Inc. with Jury Demand.(Schaper, Joseph) (Modified on 11/25/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 23, 2015 Filing 242 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Riley Power, Inc. (Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 241 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Riley Power, Inc.(Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 240 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Julie Nord Friedman, Erik K. Falk on behalf of Riley Power, Inc. (Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 239 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. (Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 238 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by IMO Industries, Inc.(Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 237 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Julie Nord Friedman, Erik K. Falk on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 236 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 235 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc.(Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 234 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Julie Nord Friedman and Erik K. Falk on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Friedman, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 233 PROPOSED ORDER Order Dismissing American Electric Power Company, Inc. pursuant to Plaintiffs' filing of #221 Notice of No Opposition to American Electric Power Company's Motion to Dismiss by American Electric Power Company, Inc. (Grove, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2015 Filing 232 ANSWER to #202 Cross-Claim by Mueller Steam Specialty and Answer to any and all Cross-Claims Otherwise Filed (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 231 ANSWER to #202 Cross-Claim by Clyde Union, Inc. and Answer to any and all Cross-Claims Otherwise Filed(Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 230 ANSWER to #202 Cross-Claim by The Young Group, Ltd. and Answer to any and all Cross-Claims Otherwise Filed (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 229 ANSWER to #202 Cross-Claim by FMC Corporation and Answer to any and all Cross-Claims Otherwise Filed (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 228 ANSWER to #202 Cross-Claim by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) and Answer to any and all Cross-Claims Otherwise Filed (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 227 MOTION by ABB, Inc. for Joinder in #61 MOTION by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company to Dismiss Short Form Complaint, #62 Memorandum In Support (Grove, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2015 Filing 226 ANSWER to #207 Cross-Claim by FMC Corporation (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 225 ANSWER to #207 Cross-Claim by Mueller Steam Specialty (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 224 ANSWER to #207 Cross-Claim by Clyde Union, Inc. (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 223 ANSWER to #207 Cross-Claim by The Young Group, Ltd. (Beeson, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Filing 222 ANSWER to #207 Cross-Claim by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) (Beeson, Joseph)
November 20, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders to #73 MOTION by American Electric Power Company, Inc. to Dismiss Short Form Complaint (Chervenick, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 220 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Reading Crane and Engineering Company (Wrabley, Christian)
November 20, 2015 Filing 219 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nagle Pumps, Inc. with Jury Demand and Cross-claims and Answer to Cross Claims that have been filed or may be filed in the future. (Fiorilli, Mark) (Modified on 11/20/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 20, 2015 Filing 218 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. and Cross-claims and Answer to Cross Claims that have been filed or may be filed in the future.(Fiorilli, Mark)
November 20, 2015 Filing 217 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Thermo Electric Company, Inc. (Olszewski, Edmund)
November 20, 2015 Filing 216 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Thermo Electric Company, Inc.(Olszewski, Edmund)
November 19, 2015 Filing 215 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Eichleay Corporation (Petrina, Joseph)
November 19, 2015 Filing 214 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant West Virginia Electric Supply Company (Petrina, Joseph)
November 19, 2015 Filing 213 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant State Electric Supply Company (Petrina, Joseph)
November 19, 2015 Filing 212 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Minnotte Contracting Corporation (Petrina, Joseph)
November 19, 2015 Filing 211 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant M. S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 19, 2015 Filing 210 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc. (Petrina, Joseph)
November 18, 2015 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #174 Answer to Short Form Complaint by American Gage & Machine Company. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Incorrect image removed; correct image filed at entry #176. (skh)
November 18, 2015 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #201 Motion by Allied Glove Corporation for Disclosure. ERROR: Incorrect event selected. CORRECTION: Image removed and re-filed using the event Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1, entry #409 . (skh)
November 18, 2015 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #187 Answer to Complaint by Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc. ERROR: Incorrect event selected. CORRECTION: Image (civil cover sheet) removed and attached to the #186 Answer to Short Form Complaint by Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc. as attachment #1. (skh)
November 18, 2015 Filing 208 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Flsmidth Inc. (Mlinac, Stephen)
November 18, 2015 Filing 207 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Flsmidth Inc., Answer to any and all Crossclaims and Crossclaim for Contribution and Indemnity.(Mlinac, Stephen) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 17, 2015 Filing 209 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Allied Glove Corporation. (skh)
November 17, 2015 Filing 206 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Team Industrial Services, Inc. (Johnson, Diana)
November 17, 2015 Filing 205 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Team Industrial Services, Inc.(Johnson, Diana)
November 17, 2015 Filing 204 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Cameron International Corporation (Johnson, Diana)
November 17, 2015 Filing 203 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cameron International Corporation.(Johnson, Diana)
November 17, 2015 Filing 202 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allied Glove Corporation, Answer to any and all Crossclaims and Crossclaim for Contribution and Indemnity.(Mlinac, Stephen) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
November 17, 2015 Filing 201 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #209. (Modified on 11/18/2015 to remove image and re-file it as entry #209) (skh).
November 17, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen R. Mlinac on behalf of Allied Glove Corporation. (Mlinac, Stephen)
November 17, 2015 Filing 199 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Sager Corporation (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 17, 2015 Filing 198 BRIEF by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders in opposition to #61 MOTION by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company to Dismiss Short Form Complaint, #73 MOTION by American Electric Power Company, Inc. to Dismiss Short Form Complaint (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Chervenick, David) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to remove link to #62 memorandum) (skh).
November 17, 2015 Filing 197 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Plotkin Brothers Supply, LLP (Cerrone, Shannan)
November 17, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannan Noe Cerrone on behalf of Plotkin Brothers Supply, LLP. (Cerrone, Shannan)
November 17, 2015 Filing 195 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant North American Manufacturing Company (Cerrone, Shannan)
November 17, 2015 Filing 194 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North American Manufacturing Company. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Cerrone, Shannan)
November 17, 2015 Filing 193 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannan Noe Cerrone on behalf of North American Manufacturing Company. (Cerrone, Shannan)
November 17, 2015 Filing 192 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation (Fowler, Stephen)
November 17, 2015 Filing 191 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Megan Leigh Fulcher updating her name on behalf of 4520 Corp., Inc., American Optical Corporation, Benjamin F. Shaw Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Flowserve U.S. Inc.(and its Limitorque Brand), Flowserve U.S., Inc.(and its Gestra Brand), Flowserve US, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company, UB West Virginia, Inc. (Fulcher, Megan)
November 17, 2015 Filing 190 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and Answer To Cross Claims by Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc.(Mulhall, James)
November 16, 2015 Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by McCarls, Inc. in support of #188 MOTION by McCarls, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Orszulak, Joseph)
November 16, 2015 Filing 188 MOTION by McCarls, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Orszulak, Joseph) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 187 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 11/18/2015 to remove image and attach it to entry #186 as attachment #1 (civil cover sheet)). (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 186 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Murray's Sheet Metal Company, Inc.(Bays, Robert) (Attachment added on 11/18/2015: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (skh). (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add civil cover sheet as attachment #1) (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Roper Pump Company in support of #184 MOTION by Roper Pump Company to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Orszulak, Joseph)
November 16, 2015 Filing 184 MOTION by Roper Pump Company to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Short Form Complaint)(Orszulak, Joseph) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #184 notice of removal) (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Premier Refractories, Inc. in support of #181 MOTION Premier Refractories, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Orszulak, Joseph)
November 16, 2015 Filing 182 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and Answer to Cross Claims by Surface Combustion.(Mulhall, James)
November 16, 2015 Filing 181 MOTION Premier Refractories, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Short Form Complaint)(Orszulak, Joseph) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 180 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and Answer to Cross Claims by Eaton Corporation.(Mulhall, James)
November 16, 2015 Filing 179 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Fraley, J.)
November 16, 2015 Filing 178 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McNeil (Ohio) Corporation (Fraley, J.)
November 16, 2015 Filing 177 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant American Gage & Machine Company (Fraley, J.)
November 16, 2015 Filing 176 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and Notice of Non-Parties by American Gage & Machine Company.(Fraley, J.)
November 16, 2015 Filing 175 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and Notice of Non-Parties by McNeil (Ohio) Corporation.(Fraley, J.)
November 16, 2015 Filing 174 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #176. (Modified on 11/18/2015 to remove incorrect image; correct image filed at entry #176) (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 173 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and Notice of Non-Parties by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(Fraley, J.)
November 16, 2015 Filing 172 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant American Optical Corporation (Fulcher, Megan)
November 16, 2015 Filing 171 CIVIL COVER SHEET by American Optical Corporation to #170 Answer to Short Form Complaint (Fulcher, Megan)
November 16, 2015 Filing 170 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by American Optical Corporation.(Fulcher, Megan) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 169 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant UB West Virginia, Inc. (Fulcher, Megan)
November 16, 2015 Filing 168 CIVIL COVER SHEET by UB West Virginia, Inc. to #167 Answer to Short Form Complaint (Fulcher, Megan)
November 16, 2015 Filing 167 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by UB West Virginia, Inc.(Fulcher, Megan) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 166 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Flowserve U.S. Inc. (as successor to), Edward Valves, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc. (and its Gestra Brand), Flowserve US, Inc. (and its Limitorque Brand), Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company (Fulcher, Megan)
November 16, 2015 Filing 165 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Flowserve U.S. Inc. (as successor to), Edward Valves, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc. (and its Gestra Brand), Flowserve US, Inc. (and its Limitorque Brand), Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company to #164 Answer to Short Form Complaint (Fulcher, Megan)
November 16, 2015 Filing 164 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Flowserve U.S. Inc. (as successor to), Edward Valves, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc. (and its Gestra Brand), Flowserve US, Inc. (and its Limitorque Brand), Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Rockwell Manufacturing Company.(Fulcher, Megan) (Modified on 11/18/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 16, 2015 Filing 163 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Magnetek, Inc. (Singley, David)
November 13, 2015 Filing 162 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Fluor Constructors International, Inc.(Fowler, Stephen)
November 13, 2015 Filing 161 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.(Fowler, Stephen)
November 13, 2015 Filing 160 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Fluor Corporation.(Fowler, Stephen)
November 13, 2015 Filing 159 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Fowler, Stephen)
November 13, 2015 Filing 158 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) (Beeson, Joseph)
November 13, 2015 Filing 157 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beeson, Joseph) (Modified on 11/14/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 13, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by David K. Hendrickson for Attorney Barbara A. Sampbles requesting removal from the Court's service list on behalf of CBS Corporation. (Hendrickson, David)
November 13, 2015 Filing 155 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Kimberly) (Modified on 11/14/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to defendant SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., f/k/a Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc., f/k/a The Marley Cooling Tower Company by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Chervenick, David)
November 12, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT as to defendant Atlas Industries, Inc. by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Chervenick, David)
November 12, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT as to defendant Jabo Supply Corporation by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Chervenick, David)
November 12, 2015 Filing 151 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Mueller Steam Specialty (Beeson, Joseph)
November 12, 2015 Filing 150 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mueller Steam Specialty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beeson, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 149 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alfa Laval, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Cerrone, Shannan)
November 12, 2015 Filing 148 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. (Cerrone, Shannan)
November 12, 2015 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannan Noe Cerrone on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc. (Cerrone, Shannan)
November 12, 2015 Filing 146 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Clyde Union, Inc. (Beeson, Joseph)
November 12, 2015 Filing 145 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clyde Union, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beeson, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 144 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant FMC Corporation (Beeson, Joseph)
November 12, 2015 Filing 143 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beeson, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 142 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Young Group, Ltd. (Beeson, Joseph)
November 12, 2015 Filing 141 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Young Group, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beeson, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 140 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reading Crane and Engineering Company.(Wrabley, Christian) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 139 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by M. S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc.(Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 138 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State Electric Supply Company.(Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 137 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Minnotte Contracting Corporation.(Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 136 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by West Virginia Electric Supply Company.(Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 135 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Eichleay Corporation.(Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
November 12, 2015 Filing 134 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc.(Petrina, Joseph) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 11, 2015 Filing 133 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Watson McDaniel Company (Geis, Dennis)
November 11, 2015 Filing 132 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Watson McDaniel Company.(Geis, Dennis) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 11, 2015 Filing 131 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc. (Mulhall, James)
November 11, 2015 Filing 130 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Surface Combustion (Mulhall, James)
November 11, 2015 Filing 129 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Eaton Corporation (Mulhall, James)
November 11, 2015 Filing 128 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Amdura LLC (Mulhall, James)
November 11, 2015 Filing 127 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for defendant Acco Material Handling Solutions, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Mulhall, James) (Modified on 11/13/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 11, 2015 Filing 126 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for defendant Surface Combustion, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by Surface Combustion, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Mulhall, James) (Modified on 11/13/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 11, 2015 Filing 125 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Armstrong International, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Polley, Richard)(Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 11, 2015 Filing 124 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for defendant Eaton Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by Eaton Corporation, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Mulhall, James) (Modified on 11/13/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 11, 2015 Filing 123 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (Polley, Richard)
November 11, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Polley, Shannan Noe Cerrone on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Polley, Richard)
November 11, 2015 Filing 121 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for defendant Amdura, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the short form complaint by Amdura LLC, Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Mulhall, James) (Modified on 11/13/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 11, 2015 Filing 120 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Blue M (Robertson, G.)
November 10, 2015 Filing 119 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants 4520 Corp., Inc., Benjamin F. Shaw Company (Fulcher, Megan)
November 10, 2015 Filing 118 CIVIL COVER SHEET by 4520 Corp., Inc., Benjamin F. Shaw Company re: #117 Answer to Short Form Complaint (Fulcher, Megan)
November 10, 2015 Filing 117 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by 4520 Corp., Inc., Benjamin F. Shaw Company.(Fulcher, Megan) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 10, 2015 Filing 116 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Magnetek, Inc. and REPLY to Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants and Third-Party Defendants (Singley, David) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 10, 2015 Filing 115 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Johnson, Diana)
November 10, 2015 Filing 114 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand.(Johnson, Diana) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(skh).
November 10, 2015 Filing 113 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Wheeling Rubber Products, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fraley, J.)
November 10, 2015 Filing 112 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Wheeling Rubber Products, Inc. and CROSS-CLAIM for Contribution and/or Indemnification and ANSWER to any cross-claims filed. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fraley, J.) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 10, 2015 Filing 111 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant American Electric Power Company, Inc. (Grove, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2015 Filing 110 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Appalachian Power Company (Leahey, Michael)
November 10, 2015 Filing 109 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant American Electric Power Service Corporation (Leahey, Michael)
November 10, 2015 Filing 108 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant ABB, Inc. (Grove, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2015 Filing 107 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Arbogast, Andrew)
November 10, 2015 Filing 106 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant United States Steel Corporation. (Arbogast, Andrew)
November 10, 2015 Filing 105 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Crane Company, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fraley, J.)
November 10, 2015 Filing 104 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Arbogast, Andrew) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to correct link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 10, 2015 Filing 103 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Steel Corporation. (Arbogast, Andrew) (Modified on 11/12/2015 to correct link to #1 notice of removal and to correct party filer) (skh).
November 10, 2015 Filing 102 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Crane Company, Inc. and CROSS-CLAIM for Contribution and/or Indemnification and ANSWER to any cross-claims filed. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fraley, J.)
November 10, 2015 Filing 101 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Ahlstrom Pumps LLC (Johnson, Diana)
November 10, 2015 Filing 100 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ahlstrom Pumps LLC.(Johnson, Diana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 99 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Bechtel Corporation (Victorson, Michael)
November 9, 2015 Filing 98 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Victorson, Michael)
November 9, 2015 Filing 97 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Fairmont Supply Company (Victorson, Michael)
November 9, 2015 Filing 96 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Keystone Valve Corp. (Luxton, Steven)
November 9, 2015 Filing 95 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Keystone Valve Corp.(Luxton, Steven) (Modified on 11/10/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
November 9, 2015 Filing 94 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant ITT Corporation (Luxton, Steven)
November 9, 2015 Filing 93 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by ITT Corporation.(Luxton, Steven) (Modified on 11/10/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand)(skh).
November 9, 2015 Filing 92 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Elliott Company (Luxton, Steven)
November 9, 2015 Filing 91 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Elliott Company.(Luxton, Steven) (Modified on 11/10/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
November 9, 2015 Filing 90 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Lafferre, Luke)
November 9, 2015 Filing 89 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.(Lafferre, Luke)
November 9, 2015 Filing 88 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Nash Engineering Company.(Mroz, Kenneth) (Modified on 11/10/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (skh).
November 9, 2015 Filing 87 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Lindberg (Robertson, G.)
November 9, 2015 Filing 86 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Lindberg. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robertson, G.)
November 9, 2015 Filing 85 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Dezurik, Inc. (Robertson, G.)
November 9, 2015 Filing 84 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dezurik, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robertson, G.)
November 9, 2015 Filing 83 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Blue M. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robertson, G.)
November 9, 2015 Filing 82 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Robertson, G.)
November 9, 2015 Filing 81 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Aurora Pump Company. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robertson, G.)
November 6, 2015 Filing 80 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT attached to #1 Notice of Removal by United Conveyor Corporation. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Sopher, Jeanne) (Modified on 11/6/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 6, 2015 Filing 79 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant United Conveyor Corporation (Sopher, Jeanne)
November 6, 2015 Filing 78 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT attached to #1 Notice of Removal by ABB, Inc. (Grove, Jeffrey) (Modified on 11/6/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 6, 2015 Filing 77 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Duro Dyne Corportation and CROSS-CLAIM by Duro Dyne Corportation and Answer by Duro Dyne Corporation to all Cross-Claims of Defendants Asserting Cross-Claims or who may assert Cross-Claims.(Negley, Christopher)
November 6, 2015 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Electric Power Company, Inc. in support #73 MOTION by American Electric Power Company, Inc. to Dismiss Short Form Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Grove, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2015 Filing 75 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Duro Dyne Corporation (Negley, Christopher)
November 6, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher D. Negley, William R. Slicer on behalf of Duro Dyne Corporation. (Negley, Christopher)
November 6, 2015 Filing 73 MOTION by American Electric Power Company, Inc. to Dismiss Short Form Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Grove, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2015 Filing 72 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Flsmidth Dorr-Oliver Eimco, Inc. (Schaper, Joseph)
November 6, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of Flsmidth Dorr-Oliver Eimco, Inc. (Schaper, Joseph)
November 6, 2015 Filing 70 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Hinchliffe & Keener, Inc. (Fiorilli, Mark)
November 6, 2015 Filing 69 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Nagle Pumps, Inc. (Fiorilli, Mark)
November 5, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Robert Stevenson, Richard C. Polley on behalf of The Sager Corporation. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 5, 2015 Filing 67 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 5, 2015 Filing 66 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, Cross-Claims and Answer to Cross-Claims by Spirax Sarco, Inc.(Stevenson, Timothy)
November 5, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Robert Stevenson, Edmund L. Olszewski on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Stevenson, Timothy)
November 5, 2015 Filing 64 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT attached to #1 Notice of Removal by Appalachian Power Company.(Leahey, Michael) (Modified on 11/5/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 5, 2015 Filing 63 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT attached to #1 Notice of Removal by American Electric Power Service Corporation.(Leahey, Michael) (Modified on 11/5/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 5, 2015 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company in support of #61 MOTION by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company to Dismiss Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Leahey, Michael)
November 5, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company to Dismiss Short Form Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Leahey, Michael) (Modified on 11/5/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 4, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by L. John Argento and Stephen R. Mlinac on behalf of Flsmidth Inc. (Argento, L.)
November 4, 2015 Filing 59 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bechtel Corporation.(Victorson, Michael) (Modified on 11/4/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 4, 2015 Filing 58 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Victorson, Michael) (Modified on 11/4/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 4, 2015 Filing 57 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fairmont Supply Company.(Victorson, Michael) (Modified on 11/4/2015 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
November 4, 2015 Filing 56 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT to November 20, 2015 by Hinchliffe & Keener, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Fiorilli, Mark)
November 4, 2015 Filing 55 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT to November 20, 2015 by Nagle Pumps, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Fiorilli, Mark) (Modified on 11/4/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 4, 2015 Filing 54 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT to November 20, 2015 by Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Roy A. Siders, Nancy Siders (Fiorilli, Mark) (Modified on 11/4/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
November 3, 2015 Filing 53 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Cashco, Inc. (Shah, Raj) ((skh).
November 3, 2015 Filing 52 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Corbesco, Inc. (Smallwood, Edward)
November 2, 2015 Filing 51 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Beazer East, Inc., Koppers Co., Inc. (Leight, Robert)
November 2, 2015 Filing 50 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Beazer East, Inc., f/k/a Koppers Co., Inc.(Leight, Robert) (Modified on 11/2/2015 to correct party filers) (skh).
November 2, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert R. Leight on behalf of Beazer East, Inc., Koppers Co., Inc. (Leight, Robert) (Modified on 11/2/2015 to correct party filers) (skh).
October 30, 2015 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant John Crane, Inc. (Anetakis, George)
October 30, 2015 Filing 47 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by John Crane, Inc. and Crossclaims by John Crane, Inc. against All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A to Answer to Complaint)(Anetakis, George)
October 30, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Andrew Fiorilli, Adam J. Warhola, Richard C. Polley on behalf of Nagle Pumps, Inc. (Fiorilli, Mark)
October 30, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Andrew Fiorilli, Adam J. Warhola, Richard C. Polley on behalf of Hinchliffe & Keener, Inc.. (Fiorilli, Mark)
October 30, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Andrew Fiorilli, Adam J. Warhola, Richard C. Polley on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Fiorilli, Mark)
October 30, 2015 Filing 43 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Hewitt, Patrick)
October 30, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick A. Hewitt for Attorney William J. Witte on behalf of Genuine Parts Company. (Hewitt, Patrick)
October 29, 2015 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Safety First Industries, Inc. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 29, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of Safety First Industries, Inc. (Schaper, Joseph)
October 28, 2015 Filing 39 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company (Mroz, Kenneth)
October 28, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kenneth S. Mroz on behalf of The Nash Engineering Company. (Mroz, Kenneth)
October 28, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kenneth S. Mroz (Mroz, Kenneth)
October 27, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip P. Keating on behalf of Baker Hughes Incorporated, as successor-in-interest to Wemco Pumps. (Keating, Philip)
October 27, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip P. Keating on behalf of Baker Hughes Incorporated, as successor-in-interest to Lewis Pumps. (Keating, Philip)
October 27, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip P. Keating on behalf of Flsmidth Salt Lake City, Inc. (Keating, Philip)
October 26, 2015 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Howden North America, Inc. (Hewitt, Patrick)
October 26, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick A. Hewitt for Attorney Sandra L. Alven on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Hewitt, Patrick)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/23/2015. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/7/2015. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/14/2015. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 12/28/2015 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 1/7/2016. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/11/2016. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/23/2015. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (mmw)
October 23, 2015 Filing 30 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by General Electric Company, Research-Cottrell, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders. (Robertson, G.) (Modified on 10/23/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
October 23, 2015 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation (Robertson, G.)
October 23, 2015 Filing 28 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robertson, G.)
October 22, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raj A. Shah, R. Scott Long, Jeffry H. Hall on behalf of Cashco, Inc. (Shah, Raj)
October 22, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne W. Sopher on behalf of United Conveyor Corporation. (Sopher, Jeanne)
October 21, 2015 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Industrial Rubber Products (Geis, Dennis)
October 21, 2015 Filing 24 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Industrial Rubber Products.(Geis, Dennis)
October 21, 2015 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant CBS Corporation (Hendrickson, David) (Attachment added on 10/23/2015: #1 Service upon individuals who are not electronic filers received 10/23/2015) (skh). (Modified on 10/23/2015 to add attachment #1)(skh).
October 20, 2015 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Robertson, G.)
October 20, 2015 Filing 21 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robertson, G.)
October 13, 2015 Filing 20 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Robertson, G.)
October 7, 2015 Filing 19 REPLY by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders to #17 Response In Opposition. (Chervenick, David) (Modified on 10/7/2015 to remove link to #14 motion) (skh).
October 6, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward A. Smallwood, Trisha A. Gill on behalf of Corbesco, Inc. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 5, 2015 Filing 17 RESPONSE by General Electric Company in opposition to #14 MOTION by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Robertson, G.)
September 30, 2015 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by CBS Corporation for Answer to Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal and Answer to Cross-Claims. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Answer and Answer to Cross-Claims filed on 9/28/2015) (tmh)
September 29, 2015 Filing 15 BRIEF by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders in support of #14 MOTION by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Chervenick, David)
September 29, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION by Nancy Siders, Roy A. Siders to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Chervenick, David)
September 28, 2015 Filing 13 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS Corporation and Answer to Cross-claims.(Hendrickson, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED MAY 7, 2014. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
September 18, 2015 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (skh)
September 18, 2015 Filing 12 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and CROSSCLAIMS by The Sager Corporation. (tmh) (electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 11 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Hinchliffe & Keener, Inc. (tmh) (electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 10 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS by CBS Corporation. (tmh) (electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 9 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plotkin Brothers Supply, LLP. (tmh) (electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 8 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand, CROSS-CLAIMS, and ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS by McCarls, Inc. (tmh)(electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by McNeil (Ohio) Corporation. (tmh)(electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 6 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by American Gage & Machine Company. (tmh) (electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 5 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safety First Industries, Inc. (tmh) (electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigiation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 4 ANSWER TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIMS by Corbesco, Inc. (tmh) (electronically filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, Master Litigation File, Civil Action No. 03-C-9600)
September 18, 2015 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant General Electric Company. (tmh)
September 18, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company with summons, Short Form Complaint, 2013 Master Complaint originally filed in Kanawha Co. Circuit, Mass Litigation Case 03-C-9600, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0425-4127006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siders et al v. 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International
Represented By: Lori Streets Muldoon
Represented By: Stephen M. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Steel & Wire Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20th Century Glove Corporation of Texas
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles M. Love, III
Represented By: Diana Leigh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rust Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard-Line
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel, LLC
Represented By: David A. Bosak
Represented By: Andrew P. Arbogast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundyne Corporation
Represented By: Lola M. James
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Jason Michael English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue M
Represented By: G. Kenneth Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Leidigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Gage & Machine Company
Represented By: Jon B. Orndorff
Represented By: J. Philip Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Singley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seco/Warwick Corporation
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & Veatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: David A. Bosak
Represented By: Andrew P. Arbogast
Represented By: Keith D. Fisher
Represented By: Edward W. Rugeley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swindell-Dressler International Company
Represented By: Robert D. Leidigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4520 Corp., Inc.
Represented By: J. Tyler Dinsmore
Represented By: Megan F. Bosak
Represented By: Frances M. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Robert H. Sweeney, Jr.
Represented By: Brian S. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Dyne Corporation
Represented By: Christopher D. Negley
Represented By: William R. Slicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Lola M. James
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Jason Michael English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roper Pump Company
Represented By: Joseph L. Orszulak, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acco Material Handling Solution, Inc.
Represented By: Francis J. Stanek
Represented By: Mark A. Moses
Represented By: James J.A. Mulhall
Represented By: Devin C. Daines
Represented By: J. Greg Goodykoontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashco, Inc.
Represented By: Raj A. Shah
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Union, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph S. Beeson
Represented By: Beth Ann Rauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Leight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: L. John Argento
Represented By: Kenneth S. Mroz
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Stephen R. Mlinac
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Pumps
Represented By: Philip P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabo Supply Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mundet Cork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Leidigh
Represented By: Leo Gerard Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S., Inc.
Represented By: J. Tyler Dinsmore
Represented By: Megan F. Bosak
Represented By: Frances M. Rollins
Represented By: Ollie M. Harton
Represented By: Kelly Calder Mowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain Company
Represented By: Jason E. Roma
Represented By: Rodney L. Baker, II
Represented By: Jessica L. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Decapio
Represented By: George J. Anetakis
Represented By: Carl A. Frankovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&L Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flsmidth Dorr-Oliver Eimco, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Garp Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: A. Timothy Jones
Represented By: Margaret A. Droppleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Electric Supply Company
Represented By: Joni Mangino
Represented By: Joseph Richard Petrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarls, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Bentz
Represented By: Joseph L. Orszulak, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbesco, Inc.
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swindell-Dressler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company
Represented By: A. Timothy Jones
Represented By: Kelly Calder Mowen
Represented By: Margaret A. Droppleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: Craig R. Banford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety First Supply
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullair Corporation
Represented By: Lola M. James
Represented By: Concetta A. Silvaggio
Represented By: Jason Michael English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Kanzler, Victor Manufacturing & Gasket Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Represented By: Barbara Allen Samples
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abex Corporation, Friction Products Division
Represented By: A. Timothy Jones
Represented By: Margaret A. Droppleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Regrut Mitchell
Represented By: Bridget L. Baranyai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dravo Corporation
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Shannan Noe Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Edmund L. Olszewski, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy Robert Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Represented By: J. Tyler Dinsmore
Represented By: Megan F. Bosak
Represented By: Frances M. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Represented By: R. Scott Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Refractories, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Orszulak, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sager Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Robert Stevenson
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinchliffe & Keener, Inc.
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fiorilli
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flsmidth Inc.
Represented By: L. John Argento
Represented By: Stephen R. Mlinac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Jason E. Roma
Represented By: Rodney L. Baker, II
Represented By: Jessica L. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plotkin Brothers Supply, LLP
Represented By: Shannan Noe Cerrone
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheelabrator Air Pollution Control, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Singley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Valves, Inc.
Represented By: J. Tyler Dinsmore
Represented By: Megan F. Bosak
Represented By: Frances M. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |