CSS, Inc. v. Herrington et al

Plaintiff: CSS, Inc.
Defendant: Christopher Herrington, Gene Yoho and Compiled Technologies, LLC
Counter_claimant: Compiled Technologies, LLC
Counter_defendant: CSS, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01762
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Wood
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment; granting said motion with respect to Count I (Copyright Infringement), Count II (Breach of Contract), Count V (Unjust Enrichme nt), Count VI (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets), and Count VIII (Declaratory Judgment) of the First Amended Complaint; denying said motion with respect to Count III (Duty of Loyalty), Count IV (Tortious Interference), and Count VII (Injunctive Relief) of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/29/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the plaintiff's 65 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/3/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 65 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/1/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting the defendants' 17 MOTION to Dismiss; directing that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/18/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (published to the court's website at www.wvsd.uscourts.gov) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSS, Inc. v. Herrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSS, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Walter A. Herring
Represented By: Katherine M. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Herrington
Represented By: Robert L. Bays
Represented By: Kaitlyn McKitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Yoho
Represented By: Robert L. Bays
Represented By: Kaitlyn McKitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compiled Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Bays
Represented By: Kaitlyn McKitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Compiled Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Bays
Represented By: Kaitlyn McKitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: CSS, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Walter A. Herring
Represented By: Katherine M. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?