United States of America ex rel. et al v. Boyko et al
Case Number: 2:2017cv04213
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The 156 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and the 160 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 5/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the 116 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant, Martin Gottlieb & Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is GRANTED and that the [1 08] Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is GRANTED; the 110 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is DENIED as to the claims, asserted in Counts One and Two, that Dr. Perni made, or caused to be made, false records and/or a false claim, as to the rec ords and billing associated with the Relator's August 2-3 emergency room visit, and GRANTED as to all other claims and all other Defendants. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/31/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The 53 MOTION by Martin Gottlieb & Associates LLC to Dismiss 1 Complaint is GRANTED; and the 56 MOTION by Bestpractices of West Virginia, Inc., Bestpractices, Inc., Michael J. Boyko, MD, Emcare, Inc., Envision He althcare Corporation, Holiday Acquisition Company, Inc., Mark Perni, DO to Dismiss 1 Complaint is DENIED as to the claim asserted in Count Two, that Dr. Perni made, used, or caused to be made or used, a false record as to the medical records associated with the Relator's August 2-3 emergency room visit, and GRANTED as to all other claims and all other Defendants. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America ex rel. et al v. Boyko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?