Banks v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Caleb Banks |
Defendant: |
Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Kenneth R. Conaway, Betsy Ross and Lisa McGahan |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00259 |
Filed: |
February 5, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Kanawha |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas E. Johnston |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 20, 2019 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 100 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and denying as moot 52 Motion to Reconsider; because the amendment deprives this Court of subject matter jurisdiction, this matter is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 2/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
|
July 23, 2018 |
Filing
45
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 MOTION by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Dismiss; the Court DISMISSES Count I from plaintiff's Complaint and DISMISSES IN PART Count II, insofar as it alleges claims of bad faith and breach of good faith and fair dealing relating to Nationwide's failure to pay plaintiff's insurance claim; Count II may only proceed as a claim alleging bad faith under the limitations articulated by this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/23/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
July 13, 2018 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 9 MOTION by Caleb Banks to Remand; granting Nationwide Adjusters' 4 MOTION to Dismiss; DISMISSES Count III from Plaintiff's Complaint, and DISMISSES Defendants Kenneth Conway, Betsy Ross, and Lisa McGahan from the case; granting 3 MOTION by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Correct 1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/13/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?