Gibson v. Morris et al
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Gibson
Defendant: India Morris, Jessica Mae Surface and Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01189
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL ORDER Directing that Plaintiff's and co-defendant India Morris claims against defendant Jessica Mae Surface are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own respective costs, legal fees, and expenses; to the extent that Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. could ever have a claim against Jessica Mae Surface arising out of the subject matter of this lawsuit, this suit is dismissed against Jessica Mae Surface without prejudice as to Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc., only; this matter will remain in litigation as to plaintiff's claims against defendants India Morris and Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/6/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Partial Dismissal Order by Jessica Mae Surface, Donald Ray Gibson, India Morris, Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. (Slicer, William) (Modified on 9/5/2018 to add party filers) (kp).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/28/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/10/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/17/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 a.m. on 10/26/2018 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/5/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/5/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/17/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/24/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 a.m. on 9/28/2018 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/8/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
July 31, 2018 SET ANSWER DEADLINE for Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. to 9/28/2018. (kp)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Coventry Health Care of West Virginia, Inc. has until 9/28/2018, to answer, move, or otherwise file a responsive pleading to the Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal by Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc., Donald Ray Gibson. (Murphy, Glen) (Modified on 7/31/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filer) (kp).
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. (Murphy, Glen)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
July 27, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6667150. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Gibson
Represented By: H. Wyatt Hanna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: India Morris
Represented By: Andrew F. Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Mae Surface
Represented By: William R. Slicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Glen A. Murphy
Represented By: James Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?