Davis v. United States of America
Petitioner: Kevin Wayne Davis
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01196
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Timothy D. Boggess appearing on behalf of United States of America. (Boggess, Timothy)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Answer to #116 MOTION by Kevin Wayne Davis to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255 due within 60 days of the entry of this Order; movant may, if he wishes, file a reply within 45 days after service of the Answer by the United States. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 2:15-cr-00119. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/1/2018. (cc: attys) (tmr)
August 1, 2018 Filing 119 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF 2255 MOTION by Kevin Wayne Davis to U. S. Attorney with copy to Movant, Judge and Magistrate Judge. (tmr)
July 31, 2018 Filing 118 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: Judge Copenhaver; Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; Defendant; USA; USM; USP) Cross Reference Criminal Number 2:15-cr-00119. (klc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kevin Wayne Davis in support of #116 MOTION by Kevin Wayne Davis to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 2:15-cr-00119. (cbo)
July 27, 2018 Filing 116 MOTION by Kevin Wayne Davis to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 2:15-cr-00119. (cbo) Modified document number on 7/31/2018 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy D. Boggess
Represented By: Lisa G. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Wayne Davis
Represented By: Jeremy Gordon
Represented By: Gary A. Collias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?