Moore et al v. Purdue Pharma L. P. et al

Plaintiff: Bobbie Lou Moore and R. R. C.
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L. P., McKesson Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01231
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Bobbie Lou Moore, R. R. C. for Motion for Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 For Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Motion to transfer, #2 Brief in support of Motion, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Statement regarding oral argument, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Ambrosio Complaint, #7 Flanagan Complaint, #8 Hunt Complaint, #9 Moore Complaint, #10 Rees Complaint, #11 Salmons Complaint, #12 Wood Complaint)(Barney, David) (Modified on 9/24/2018 to add party filer) (kp).
September 14, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re: #7 Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State. (taq)
September 14, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Actavis LLC re: #5 Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State. (taq)
September 13, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re: #7 Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State on 8/20/2018 as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (ts)
September 13, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Actavis LLC re: #5 Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State on 8/20/2018 as to Actavis LLC. (ts)
September 10, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION The Manufacturer Defendants have accepted service in exchange for Plaintiffs agreement to extend the respective response deadline to 60 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation reaches a decision on consolidation re: #1 Complaint by Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bobbie Lou Moore, R. R. C., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis LLC (Bello, Patricia) (Modified on 9/11/2018 to add party filers) (kp).
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S #1 COMPLAINT by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation,. R. R. C., Bobbie Lou Moore (Ruby, Steven) (Modified on 9/10/2018 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filers) (kp).
August 30, 2018 Filing 25 CLERK'S ORDER. For reasons appearing to the court, this action is hereby REASSIGNED from Judge Thomas E. Johnston to Judge David A. Faber. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 08/30/2018. (cc: Judge Johnston; Judge Faber; counsel of record; any unrepresented party). (klc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Actavis Pharma, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Purdue Pharma, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Purdue Pharma L.P. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Cephalon, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Johnson & Johnson. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Endo Health Solutions Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Cardinal Health, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to McKesson Corporation. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Allergan PLC. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (taq)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2018 as to Actavis LLC. (taq)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) (Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct referral to Magistrate Aboulhosn)(ts).
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L. P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons issued as to McKesson Corporation, #4 Summons issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc., #5 Summons issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #6 Summons issued as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #7 Summons issued as to TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc, #8 Summons issued as to Cephalon, Inc., #9 Summons issued as to Johnson & Johnson, #10 Summons issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #11 Summons issued as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #12 Summons issued as to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., #13 Summons issued as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #14 Summons issued as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #15 Summons issued as to Allergan PLC, #16 Summons issued as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #17 Summons issued as to Watson Laboratories, Inc., #18 Summons issued as to Actavis LLC, #19 Summons issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc.) (taq)
August 15, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (ts)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Bobbie Lou Moore, R. R. C. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L. P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 summons as to Purdue Pharma Inc., #2 summons as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 summons as to McKesson Corporation, #4 summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., #5 summons as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #6 summons as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #7 summons as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #8 summons as to Cephalon, Inc., #9 summons as to Johnson & Johnson, #10 summons as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #11 summons as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #12 summons as to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., #13 summons as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #14 summons as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #15 summons as to Allergan PLC, #16 summons as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #17 summons as to Watson Laboratories, Inc., #18 summons as to Actavis LLC, #19 summons as to Actavis Pharma, Inc.) (taq)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6710323. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Purdue Pharma L. P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Lou Moore
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. R. C.
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L. P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Patricia M. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia M. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?