Harris v. The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Eugene Harris
Defendant: The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Valden Transport, Inc., Transport Service, LLC and Charles Ray Smith
Case Number: 2:2018cv01264
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Ray Smith, re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kp)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Edward Eugene Harris for Charles Ray Smith, re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Roush, Jennifer) (Modified on 10/23/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY by Charles Ray Smith, The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Transport Service, LLC, Valden Transport, Inc. to #8 Response In Opposition. (Despot Krofcheck, Lauren)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Edward Eugene Harris in opposition to #6 MOTION by Charles Ray Smith, The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Transport Service, LLC, Valden Transport, Inc. to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Answer, and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint (Roush, Jennifer)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 , #4 and #5 Disclosure Statements Pursuant to Rule 7.1. ERROR: Images did not contain appropriate signatures for counsel. CORRECTION: Signatures corrected and images replaced. (kp)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles Ray Smith, The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Transport Service, LLC, Valden Transport, Inc. in support of #6 MOTION by Charles Ray Smith, The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Transport Service, LLC, Valden Transport, Inc. to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Answer, and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint (Despot Krofcheck, Lauren)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Charles Ray Smith, The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Transport Service, LLC, Valden Transport, Inc. to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Answer, and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Despot Krofcheck, Lauren) (Modified on 8/29/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Transport Service, LLC (Despot Krofcheck, Lauren) (Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct signature and replace image) (kp).
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc. (Despot Krofcheck, Lauren) (Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct signature and replace image) (kp).
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Valden Transport, Inc. (Despot Krofcheck, Lauren) (Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct signature and replace image) (kp).
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
August 28, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Valden Transport, Inc., Transport Service, LLC, Charles Ray Smith, The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wood County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6761317. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren M. Despot Krofcheck
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valden Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren M. Despot Krofcheck
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Service, LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Despot Krofcheck
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ray Smith
Represented By: Lauren M. Despot Krofcheck
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Eugene Harris
Represented By: Jennifer D. Roush
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Represented By: R. Chad Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?