United States of America v. The Sum of $4,733.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Sum of $4,733.00 in United States Currency
Interested Party: Travis R. Edwards
Case Number: 2:2018cv01300
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture and Warrant of Arrest and Notice in Rem. (Arthur, Christopher)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER directing that David O. Schles, CJA Panel Attorney, is appointed to represent the Defendant and Interested Party in the instant matter. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/17/2018. (cc: counsel of record; Attorney David O. Schles; any unrepresented party; CJA Supervising Attorney) (taq)
September 18, 2018 4 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur. (taq)
September 18, 2018 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (taq)
September 17, 2018 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 14, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
September 14, 2018 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by United States of America against The Sum of $4,733.00 in United States Currency with Verification attached. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Sum of $4,733.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sum of $4,733.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: David O. Schles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Travis R. Edwards
Represented By: David O. Schles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?