Skidmore v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Plaintiff: Tammy A. Skidmore
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01308
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY by Tammy A. Skidmore to #7 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Foster, Jason) (Modified on 11/14/2018 to remove link to #6 motion) (kp).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference is CANCELED; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 2/1/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 6/7/2019; and all depositions by 7/22/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/7/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/12/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/25/2019. Discovery to close by 7/22/2019. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 8/12/2019, with responses due by 8/26/2019 and replies due by 9/2/2019. Settlement Meeting to be held by 10/14/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 10/21/2019, with responses due by 10/28/2019. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/16/2019, and Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Charleston. Proposed Charges to the Jury by 11/26/2019. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 11/21/2019 in Charleston. Trial set for 12/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Charleston before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/8/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Tammy A. Skidmore. (Lockhart, T.) (Modified on 11/6/2018 to add party filer) (kp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Norfolk Southern Railway Company in opposition to #6 MOTION by Tammy A. Skidmore to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lockhart, T.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Tammy A. Skidmore to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Foster, Jason)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/22/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/29/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/5/2018. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 p.m. on 11/9/2018. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/14/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/23/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/11/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lockhart, T.) (Modified on 9/27/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Lockhart, T.)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 20, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Norfolk Southern Railway Company with summons, amended complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Fayette County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6813232. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skidmore v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John H. Mahaney
Represented By: T. Matthew Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy A. Skidmore
Represented By: Jason P. Foster
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?