Davis v. Justice et al
Plaintiff: Robin Jean Davis
Defendant: Jill Upson, Tom Takubo, Charles H. Clements, Eric L. Householder, Martin Atkinson, III, Marty Gearheart, Mark Zatezalo, Ryan Ferns, Rodney A. Pyles, Mike Azinger, John R. Kelly, Geoff Foster, Ruth Rowan, Justin Marcum, Mike Woelfel, Bill Hamilton, Matthew Rohrbach, Saira Blair, Carol Miller, Charlotte Lane, Frank Deem, Joe Statler, Craig Blair, Danny Hamrick, Tony Paynter, S. Marshall Wilson, Kayla Kessinger, Tom Fast, Joe Ellington, Jeffrey Pack, Ryan Weld, Sue Cline, John Shott, Ed Evans, John Overington, Kelli Sobonya, Allen V. Evans, Joshua Higginbotham, Brent Boggs, George Ambler, Riley Moore, Chanda Adkins, Cindy Frich, Steve Westfall, Danny Wagner, Daniel Linville, Mark R. Maynard, William R. Romine, Terri Sypolt, Guy Ward, Paul Espinosa, Roy Cooper, Pat McGeehan, Randy Smith, Roger Hanshaw, Kenneth Hicks, Eric Nelson, Greg Boso, Gary G. Howell, Jason Harshbarger, Ralph Rodighiero, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, John R. Unger, II, Robert D. Beach, Robert L. Karnes, Jordan Hill, Patrick Martin, Mike Maroney, Daryl Cowles, William Anderson, Dianna Graves, Mark Dean, Zack Maynard, Amy Summers, Ben Queen, Moore Capito, Jim Justice, Ray Hollen, Brad White, Vernon Criss, Lee Cassis, Steve Harrison, Dave Sypolt, Richard Ojeda, Patricia Rucker, D. Rolland Jennings, Michael Folk, Jim Butler and Kenny Mann
Case Number: 2:2018cv01316
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Robin Jean Davis pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Simmons, Lonnie)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis to Extend Generally the Deadline to Respond to #128 Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff to file her response to Defendant Jim Justice's #128 Motion to Dismiss when ordered by this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/13/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 8, 2018 Filing 139 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis to Extend Generally the Deadline to Respond to #128 MOTION by Jim Justice to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 11/9/2018 to add link to #128 motion) (kp).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #136 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis to Extend Deadline for Response; plaintiff to file her response to #128 MOTION by Jim Justice to Dismiss #1 Complaint by 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/5/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 5, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Sara See on behalf of Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Greg Boso, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Lee Cassis, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Roy Cooper, Daryl Cowles, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Ryan Ferns, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Roger Hanshaw, Steve Harrison, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, Robert L. Karnes, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Kenny Mann, Justin Marcum, Mike Maroney, Patrick Martin, Mark R. Maynard, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Richard Ojeda, John Overington, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, Patricia Rucker, John Shott, Randy Smith, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Dave Sypolt, Terri Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Ryan Weld, Steve Westfall, Brad White, S. Marshall Wilson, Mike Woelfel, Mark Zatezalo. (See, Lindsay)
November 1, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis to Extend Deadline for Response to #128 MOTION by Jim Justice to Dismiss #1 Complaint to 11/9/2018 (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER pursuant to the #133 Joint Stipulation extending Plaintiff Robin Jean Davis's time to respond to Defendant Jim Justice's motion to dismiss; construing the filing as a joint motion to extend the time to respond to Defendant's pending motion to dismiss; this Court GRANTS the motion, and ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's #128 motion by 11/2/2018; any reply must be filed within 7 days from the date of service of the memorandum in response to the motion. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/31/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
October 26, 2018 Filing 134 JOINT STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING re: #1 Complaint by Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Greg Boso, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Lee Cassis, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Roy Cooper, Daryl Cowles, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Ryan Ferns, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Roger Hanshaw, Steve Harrison, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, Robert L. Karnes, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Kenny Mann, Justin Marcum, Mike Maroney, Patrick Martin, Mark R. Maynard, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Richard Ojeda, John Overington, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, Patricia Rucker, John Shott, Randy Smith, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Dave Sypolt, Terri Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Ryan Weld, Steve Westfall, Brad White, S. Marshall Wilson, Mike Woelfel, Mark Zatezalo, Robin Jean Davis (Viglianco, Zachary) (Modified on 10/28/2018 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filers) (kp).
October 25, 2018 Filing 133 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE to #128 MOTION by Jim Justice to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Robin Jean Davis, Jim Justice (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/25/2018 to add party filer) (kp).
October 15, 2018 Filing 132 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/15/2018. (slw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 131 REPLY by Robin Jean Davis to #126 and #127 Responses In Opposition. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/16/2018 to correct links and to convert event to reply to response) (kp).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER The preliminary injunction hearing currently scheduled for 10/16/2018, is CONTINUED GENERALLY; the Court will discuss rescheduling the hearing at the 10/15/2018, telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
October 12, 2018 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM by Jim Justice in support of #128 MOTION by Jim Justice to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Talbott, Kelli)
October 12, 2018 Filing 128 MOTION by Jim Justice to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Talbott, Kelli) (Modified on 10/12/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 12, 2018 Filing 127 RESPONSE by Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Greg Boso, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Roy Cooper, Daryl Cowles, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Ryan Ferns, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Roger Hanshaw, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, Robert L. Karnes, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Kenny Mann, Justin Marcum, Mike Maroney, Patrick Martin, Mark R. Maynard, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Richard Ojeda, John Overington, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, Patricia Rucker, John Shott, Randy Smith, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Dave Sypolt, Terri Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Ryan Weld, Steve Westfall, Brad White in opposition to #12 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis for Preliminary Injunction (Viglianco, Zachary) (Modified on 10/12/2018 to add party filers) (kp).
October 12, 2018 Filing 126 RESPONSE by Jim Justice in opposition to #12 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis for Preliminary Injunction (Talbott, Kelli)
October 12, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abby G. Cunningham on behalf of Jim Justice. (Cunningham, Abby)
October 12, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caleb Andrew Ellis on behalf of Jim Justice. (Ellis, Caleb)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER telephonic status conference set for 10/15/2018 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/12/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #122 Statement of Visiting Attorney. ERROR: Image was missing page 1. CORRECTION: Page 1 obtained and image replaced. (kp)
October 11, 2018 Filing 122 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James Cole on behalf of Robin Jean Davis. Local counsel: J. Timothy DiPiero. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6850541. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/12/2018 to add page 1 and replace image) (kp).
October 11, 2018 Filing 121 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Heather Benzmiller Sultanian on behalf of Robin Jean Davis. Local counsel: J. Timothy DiPiero. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6850291. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 120 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from John Adams on behalf of Robin Jean Davis. Local counsel: J. Timothy DiPiero. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6850273. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 119 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Tacy Flint on behalf of Robin Jean Davis. Local counsel: J. Timothy DiPiero. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6850245. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 118 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Greg Boso, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Ryan Ferns, Robert L. Karnes, Kenny Mann, Mike Maroney, Mark R. Maynard, Richard Ojeda, Patricia Rucker, Randy Smith, Dave Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Ryan Weld, Mike Woelfel served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. Summons served on Stephanie Ojeda. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 117 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Roy Cooper, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Justin Marcum, Patrick Martin, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, John Shott, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Terri Sypolt, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Steve Westfall, Brad White, S. Marshall Wilson, Mark Zatezalo served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. Summons served on Jeff Billings. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelli D. Talbott on behalf of Jim Justice. (Talbott, Kelli)
October 5, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Grant on behalf of Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Greg Boso, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Lee Cassis, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Roy Cooper, Daryl Cowles, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Ryan Ferns, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Roger Hanshaw, Steve Harrison, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, Robert L. Karnes, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Kenny Mann, Justin Marcum, Mike Maroney, Patrick Martin, Mark R. Maynard, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Richard Ojeda, John Overington, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, Patricia Rucker, John Shott, Randy Smith, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Dave Sypolt, Terri Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Ryan Weld, Steve Westfall, Brad White, S. Marshall Wilson, Mike Woelfel, Mark Zatezalo. (Grant, Elizabeth) (Modified on 10/11/2018 to remove party filer) (kp).
October 5, 2018 Filing 114 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Greg Boso, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Roy Cooper, Daryl Cowles, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Ryan Ferns, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Roger Hanshaw, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, Robert L. Karnes, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Kenny Mann, Justin Marcum, Mike Maroney, Patrick Martin, Mark R. Maynard, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Richard Ojeda, John Overington, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, Patricia Rucker, John Shott, Randy Smith, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Dave Sypolt, Terri Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Ryan Weld, Steve Westfall, Brad White, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kp)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER pursuant to a telephonic status conference held 10/4/2018; and for reasons more fully stated on the record at the conference; directing the defendants' to file any response to plaintiff's #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 10/12/2018; with any reply to be filed by 10/15/2018; hearing on the Motion set for 10/16/2018 9:30 a.m. in Charleston before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/4/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
October 5, 2018 Filing 112 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Greg Boso, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Roy Cooper, Daryl Cowles, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Ryan Ferns, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Roger Hanshaw, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, Robert L. Karnes, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Kenny Mann, Justin Marcum, Mike Maroney, Patrick Martin, Mark R. Maynard, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Richard Ojeda, John Overington, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, Patricia Rucker, John Shott, Randy Smith, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Dave Sypolt, Terri Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Ryan Weld, Steve Westfall, Brad White, S. Marshall Wilson, Mike Woelfel, Mark Zatezalo, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/5/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 4, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Anthony Martin on behalf of Jim Justice. (Martin, Paul)
October 4, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Aaron Viglianco on behalf of Chanda Adkins, George Ambler, William Anderson, Martin Atkinson, III, Mike Azinger, Robert D. Beach, Craig Blair, Saira Blair, Brent Boggs, Greg Boso, Jim Butler, Moore Capito, Lee Cassis, Charles H. Clements, Sue Cline, Roy Cooper, Daryl Cowles, Vernon Criss, Mark Dean, Frank Deem, Joe Ellington, Paul Espinosa, Allen V. Evans, Ed Evans, Tom Fast, Ryan Ferns, Michael Folk, Geoff Foster, Cindy Frich, Marty Gearheart, Dianna Graves, Bill Hamilton, Danny Hamrick, Roger Hanshaw, Steve Harrison, Jason Harshbarger, Kenneth Hicks, Joshua Higginbotham, Jordan Hill, Ray Hollen, Eric L. Householder, Gary G. Howell, D. Rolland Jennings, Robert L. Karnes, John R. Kelly, Kayla Kessinger, Charlotte Lane, Daniel Linville, Sharon Lewis Malcolm, Kenny Mann, Justin Marcum, Mike Maroney, Patrick Martin, Mark R. Maynard, Zack Maynard, Pat McGeehan, Carol Miller, Riley Moore, Eric Nelson, Richard Ojeda, John Overington, Jeffrey Pack, Tony Paynter, Rodney A. Pyles, Ben Queen, Ralph Rodighiero, Matthew Rohrbach, William R. Romine, Ruth Rowan, Patricia Rucker, John Shott, Randy Smith, Kelli Sobonya, Joe Statler, Amy Summers, Dave Sypolt, Terri Sypolt, Tom Takubo, John R. Unger, II, Jill Upson, Danny Wagner, Guy Ward, Ryan Weld, Steve Westfall, Brad White, S. Marshall Wilson, Mike Woelfel, Mark Zatezalo. (Viglianco, Zachary)
October 4, 2018 Filing 109 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/4/2018. (slw)
October 4, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE to Cancel Certified Mail Service by Robin Jean Davis (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 107 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Lee Cassis. Lee Cassis served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. Summons served on Lee Cassis, Clerk of the WV Senate. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 106 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Steve Harrison. Steve Harrison served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. Summons served on The Honorable Steve Harrison, Clerk of the WV House of Delegates. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 105 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Jim Justice. Jim Justice served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. Summons served on Jim Justice, Governor. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER telephonic status conference set for 10/4/2018 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/4/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
October 3, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE to Serve Through Certified Mail by Robin Jean Davis (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 102 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Mike Woelfel, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 101 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Mark Zatezalo, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 100 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for S. Marshall Wilson, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 99 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Brad White, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 98 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Steve Westfall, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 97 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Guy Ward, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 96 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Danny Wagner, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 95 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Jill Upson, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 94 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Terri Sypolt, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 93 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Amy Summers, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 92 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Joe Statler, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 91 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Kelli Sobonya, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 90 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for John Shott, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 89 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Ruth Rowan, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 88 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for William R. Romine, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 87 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Matthew Rohrbach, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 86 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for John Overington, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 85 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Patrick Martin, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 84 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Justin Marcum, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 83 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Sharon Lewis Malcolm, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 82 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Daniel Linville, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 81 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Charlotte Lane, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 80 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Kayla Kessinger, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 79 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for John R. Kelly, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 78 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for D. Rolland Jennings, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 77 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Gary G. Howell, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 76 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Eric L. Householder, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 75 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Ray Hollen, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 74 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Jordan Hill, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 73 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Joshua Higginbotham, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 72 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Kenneth Hicks, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 71 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Jason Harshbarger, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 70 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Roger Hanshaw, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 69 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Danny Hamrick, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 68 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Bill Hamilton, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 67 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Dianna Graves, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 66 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Marty Gearheart, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 65 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Cindy Frich, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 64 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Geoff Foster, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 63 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Geoff Foster, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 62 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Michael Folk, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 61 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Tom Fast, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 60 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Allen V. Evans, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 59 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Paul Espinosa, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 58 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Joe Ellington, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 57 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Ed Evans, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 56 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Frank Deem, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 55 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Mark Dean, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 54 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Vernon Criss, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Daryl Cowles, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Roy Cooper, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 51 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Moore Capito, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 50 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Jim Butler, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Brent Boggs, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Saira Blair, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Martin Atkinson, III, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for William Anderson, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for George Ambler, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Chanda Adkins, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Mike Woelfel, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Ryan Weld, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for John R. Unger, II, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Tom Takubo, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Dave Sypolt, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Randy Smith, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Patricia Rucker, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Ben Queen, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Rodney A. Pyles, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Tony Paynter, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Jeffrey Pack, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Eric Nelson, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Riley Moore, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Carol Miller, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Pat McGeehan, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Zack Maynard, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Ralph Rodighiero, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Richard Ojeda, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Mark R. Maynard, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Mike Maroney, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Robert L. Karnes, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Steve Harrison, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Ryan Ferns, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Sue Cline, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Charles H. Clements, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Lee Cassis, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Greg Boso, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Craig Blair, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Robert D. Beach, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Mike Azinger, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Robin Jean Davis in support of #12 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis for Preliminary Injunction (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Simmons, Lonnie)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Robin Jean Davis for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Davis's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lee Cassis, Steve Harrison, Jim Justice, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Lee Cassis, #2 Summons as to Honorable Steve Harrison) (kp)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Steve Harrison, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/2/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Lee Cassis, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/2/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Jim Justice, re: #1 Complaint. (Simmons, Lonnie) (Modified on 10/2/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Timothy DiPiero, Lonnie C. Simmons on behalf of Robin Jean Davis. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION by Robert B. Allen, Pamela C. Deem withdrawing as counsel and substituting for J. Timothy DiPiero and Lonnie C. Simmons for Robin Jean Davis (Deem, Pamela)
September 26, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lee Cassis, Steve Harrison, Jim Justice re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Jim Justice, #2 Summons as to Steve Harrison) (ts)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robin Jean Davis for Lee Cassis, Steve Harrison, Jim Justice re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Steve Harrison, #2 Summons as to Lee Cassis) (ts)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6821241. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Upson
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Takubo
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Clements
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Householder
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Atkinson, III
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Gearheart
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zatezalo
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Ferns
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney A. Pyles
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Azinger
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Kelly
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoff Foster
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Rowan
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Marcum
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Woelfel
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Hamilton
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Rohrbach
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saira Blair
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Miller
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Lane
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Deem
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Statler
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Blair
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Hamrick
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Paynter
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Marshall Wilson
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Kessinger
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Fast
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Ellington
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Pack
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Weld
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Cline
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shott
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Evans
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Overington
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Sobonya
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen V. Evans
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Higginbotham
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Boggs
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ambler
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Moore
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanda Adkins
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Frich
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Westfall
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Wagner
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Linville
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Maynard
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Romine
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Sypolt
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Ward
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Espinosa
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cooper
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat McGeehan
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Smith
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Hanshaw
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hicks
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Nelson
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Boso
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary G. Howell
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Harshbarger
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Rodighiero
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Lewis Malcolm
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Unger, II
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Beach
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Karnes
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Hill
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Martin
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Maroney
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Cowles
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Anderson
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Graves
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dean
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Maynard
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Summers
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Queen
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore Capito
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Justice
Represented By: Paul Anthony Martin
Represented By: Abby G. Cunningham
Represented By: Caleb Andrew Ellis
Represented By: Kelli D. Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hollen
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad White
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Criss
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Cassis
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Harrison
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Sypolt
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ojeda
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Rucker
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rolland Jennings
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Folk
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Butler
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Mann
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Jean Davis
Represented By: Pamela C. Deem
Represented By: Robert B. Allen
Represented By: Heather Benzmiller Sultanian
Represented By: James Cole
Represented By: John Adams
Represented By: J. Timothy DiPiero
Represented By: Tacy F. Flint
Represented By: Lonnie C. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?