United States of America v. In the Sum of $42,054.45 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: In the Sum of $42,054.45 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Karl O'Dell
Case Number: 2:2018cv01325
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Troy N. Giatras on behalf of Karl O'Dell. (Giatras, Troy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture and Warrant of Arrest and Notice in Rem. (Arthur, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER the docket reflects that the Interested Party, Karl ODell, is being represented in a related criminal action, 2:18-cr-00150, by Attorney Michael J. McCarrie, Attorney Troy N. Giatras, and Attorney Matthew Stonestreet; directing that aforesaid counsel advise the Court in writing as to whether they intend to represent the Defendant and Interested Party in this Civil Action by 10/10/2018. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/2/2018. (cc: counsel of record for the United States; Michael J. McCarrie (Artz McCarrie Health Law, Suite 202, 10 Beatty Road, Media, PA 19063); Troy N. Giatras (The Giatras Law Firm, Suite 400, 118 Capitol Street, Charleston, WV 25301); Matthew Stonestreet (The Giatras Law Firm, Suite 400, 118 Capitol Street, Charleston, WV 25301); any unrepresented party) (taq)
September 27, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur. (taq)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (taq)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by United States of America against In the Sum of $42,054.45 in U.S. Currency. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. In the Sum of $42,054.45 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In the Sum of $42,054.45 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Karl O'Dell
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?