Tomaszewski et al v. St. Albans Operating Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Pauline Tomaszewski and Richard J. Tomaszewski, Sr.
Defendant: St. Albans Operating Company, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC and SavaSeniorCare, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01327
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Compel Mediation or Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint; the court DIRECTS the parties to proceed to arbitration or mediation consistent with the terms of the DRP and DISMISSES the Complaint; to the extent Defendants' Motion seeks an award of costs and attorneys' fees, the Motion is DENIED; directing that this case be DISMISSED from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/6/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #2 MOTION by SavaSeniorCare, LLC to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/6/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, St. Albans Operating Company, LLC to #12 Response In Opposition. (Hess, John)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Pauline Tomaszewski, Richard J. Tomaszewski, Sr. in opposition to #4 MOTION by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, St. Albans Operating Company, LLC to Compel Mediation or Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stonestreet, S.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/23/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/5/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/13/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 a.m. on 11/26/2018 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/3/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/2/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
September 27, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC. (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC. (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant SavaSeniorCare, LLC. (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant St. Albans Operating Company, LLC. (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, St. Albans Operating Company, LLC in support of #4 MOTION by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, St. Albans Operating Company, LLC to Compel Mediation or Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint. (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, St. Albans Operating Company, LLC to Compel Mediation or Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by SavaSeniorCare, LLC in support of #2 MOTION by SavaSeniorCare, LLC to Dismiss Complaint. (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION by SavaSeniorCare, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (kp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by St. Albans Operating Company, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC, SavaSeniorCare, LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6824473. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomaszewski et al v. St. Albans Operating Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Tomaszewski
Represented By: Andrew L. Paternostro
Represented By: S. Andrew Stonestreet
Represented By: Jeff David Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Tomaszewski, Sr.
Represented By: Andrew L. Paternostro
Represented By: S. Andrew Stonestreet
Represented By: Jeff David Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Albans Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Anders W. Lindberg
Represented By: John Andrew Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Anders W. Lindberg
Represented By: John Andrew Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Anders W. Lindberg
Represented By: John Andrew Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare, LLC
Represented By: Anders W. Lindberg
Represented By: John Andrew Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?