Tacza et al v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Donna Tacza and A. L.
Defendant: Bill J. Crouch, Alecia Martin and West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources
Case Number: 2:2018cv01330
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, re: #5 Amended Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Donna Tacza, A. L. for West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, re: #5 Amended Complaint. (Wood, Henry) (Modified on 10/31/2018 to add link to #5 amended complaint) (kp).
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Donna Tacza (and), Donna Tacza (on behalf of), A. L. against Bill J. Crouch, Alecia Martin, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources. (taq)
September 28, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill J. Crouch, Alecia Martin, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons issued as to Bill Couch) (lca)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Donna Tacza(and), Donna Tacza(on behalf of ), A. L. for Bill J. Crouch, Alecia Martin, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Summons submitted as to Bill Crouch) (lca)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6825070. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacza et al v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Tacza
Represented By: Henry E. Wood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L.
Represented By: Henry E. Wood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill J. Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alecia Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?