Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al
Plaintiff: Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668
Case Number: 2:2018cv01404
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC in support of #16 Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Declaratory Judgment,,,, Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Stay,,,, Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Preliminary Injunction,,, #23 MOTION by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC to Alter #16 Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Declaratory Judgment,,,, Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Stay,,,, Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Preliminary (Robidoux, Kaitlin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC to Alter #16 Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Declaratory Judgment,,,, Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Stay,,,, Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Preliminary Injunction,,, Judgment (Robidoux, Kaitlin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robidoux, Kaitlin)
December 13, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC. (Maroney, Thomas) (Modified on 12/13/2018 to add party filer)(kp).
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668 in opposition to #18 Supplemental Statement. (Maroney, Thomas)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ $10,000 posted by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union pursuant to #16 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered herein. (Original document placed in the Clerk's Office vault in the Charleston Division) (ts)
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC re: #16 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Robidoux, Kaitlin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Surety Bond for Preliminary Injunction BOND in the amount of $ $10,000.00 posted by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC (Attachment: #1 Surety Bond for Preliminary Injunction)(Maroney, Thomas) (Modified on 12/7/2018 to add party filers) (kp).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #12 MOTION by United Steel Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC for a preliminary injunction pending arbitration (2:18-cv-1414, ECF No. 1); and PRELIMINARILY ENJOINS AND ORDERS Constellium not to terminate its provision of healthcare benefits to its Medicare-eligible retirees as stated in the 8/24/2018 letter pending arbitration; and further ORDERS that the Union post a $10,000 bond by 12/10/2018; denying #5 MOTION by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC insofar as it requests a stay of the arbitration and DENIES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, the motion insofar as it requests declaratory judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/4/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND to #1 Complaint to 12/14/2018 by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668, Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Maroney, Thomas) (Modified on 12/4/2018 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filers) (kp).
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC to #10 Response In Opposition (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Robidoux, Kaitlin) (Modified on 12/3/2018 to remove link to #5 motion) (ts).
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 Preliminary Injunction Hearing held by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/26/2018; Court Reporter: Ayme Cochran. (slw)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 COMPLAINT AND MOTION by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit K) (filed in Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-01414 on 11/7/2018) (taq)
November 26, 2018 THIS CIVIL ACTION HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:18-cv-01414 AS OF 11/26/2018; CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:18-cv-01404 HAS BEEN DESIGNATED AS THE LEAD ACTION. ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS SHALL PROCEED UNDER THAT STYLING AND DOCKETED HEREIN. (taq)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER pursuant to a telephonic status conference on 11/20/2018; directing the two actions consolidated; Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-01404 to be designated as the lead case, and the matter to proceed under that styling; preliminary injunction hearing set for 11/26/2018 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 23, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668 in opposition to #5 MOTION by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC for Declaratory Judgment to Stay (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Maroney, Thomas) (Modified on 11/26/2018 to add party filer) (kp).
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC (Robidoux, Kaitlin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/20/2018; (slw)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER telephonic status conference set for 11/20/2018 at 12:00 p.m. before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/18/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC in support of #5 MOTION by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC to Stay Arbitration and for Declaratory Judgment (Robidoux, Kaitlin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC to Stay Arbitration and for Declaratory Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, #7 Exhibit 4 - Part 2)(Robidoux, Kaitlin).
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668, re: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to United Steel, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668) (taq)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 2, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC for United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668, re: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Summons submitted as to AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668) (taq)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6926518. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local 5668
Represented By: Thomas P. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Slaughter
Represented By: Kaitlin L. H. Robidoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?