Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company
Defendant: Hope Clinic, PLLC, Poca Valu Rite Pharmacy LLC, Teresa Emerson, Paul W. Burke, Jr., Mark A. Clarkson, Timothy Jason Lewis, James H. Blume, Jr., Inez Lewis and Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01422
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/8/2019 as to Poca Valu Rite Pharmacy LLC. (kp)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/8/2019 as to Hope Clinic, PLLC. (kp)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/8/2019 as to Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC. (kp)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER pursuant to the #13 Stipulation for an extension of time for defendant Teresa Emerson to file an answer; the Stipulation is granted and defendant Teresa Emerson to file an answer by 1/25/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION The time for Defendant, Teresa Emerson, to File an Answer to the #1 Complaint is extended to 1/25/2019 by Teresa Emerson, Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company. (Kilgore, Debra) (Modified on 1/10/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kp).
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Attorney Timothy D. Houston on 1/7/19. Timothy Jason Lewis waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019; Inez Lewis waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (McDaniel, James)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/4/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/11/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 a.m. on 2/18/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/25/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/3/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Teresa Emerson, Teresa Emerson served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (McDaniel, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS by Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company for Inez Lewis, in Her Individual Capacity and as Administratrix of the Estate of Timothy Jason James, Hope Clinic, PLLC, James H. Blume, Jr., Teresa Emerson, Paul W. Burke, Jr., Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC and Poca Valu Rite Pharmacy LLC. (filed pursuant to #8 order) (taq)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER pursuant to the #6 MOTION to Obtain Waivers of Service and for Leave to File Out of Time; directing that the plaintiff may obtain waivers of service from defendants Inez Lewis, in Her Individual Capacity and as Administratrix of the Estate of Timothy Jason Lewis; Hope Clinic, PLLC; James H. Blume, Jr., D.O.; Theresa Emerson, FNP; Paul W. Burke, Jr., M.D.; Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC; and Poca Valu-Rite Pharmacy, Inc.; the plaintiff is granted leave to file the notices and requests out of time to the aforementioned defendants; the clerk to file the notices and requests attached as Exhibit A to plaintiff's said Motion. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/21/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT by Mark A. Clarkson. (Smith, Thomas) (Modified on 12/20/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company to Obtain Waivers of Service and for Leave to File Out of Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McDaniel, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Mark A. Clarkson, Mark A. Clarkson served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (McDaniel, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James E. McDaniel on behalf of Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company. (McDaniel, James)
November 13, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hope Clinic, PLLC, James H. Blume, Jr., Teresa Emerson, Mark A. Clarkson, Paul W. Burke, Jr., Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC, Poca Valu Rite Pharmacy LLC, re: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Relief. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to James H. Blume, Jr., #2 Summons issued as to Teresa Emerson, #3 Summons issued as to Mark A. Clarkson, #4 Summons issued as to Paul W. Burke, Jr., #5 Summons issued as to Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC, #6 Summons issued as to Poca Valu Rite Pharmacy LLC) (taq)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6953421. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons as to Hope Clinic, PLLC, #4 Proposed Summons as to James H. Blume, Jr., #5 Proposed Summons as to Teresa Emerson, #6 Proposed Summons as to Mark A. Clarkson, #7 Proposed Summons as to Paul W. Burke, Jr., #8 Proposed Summons as to Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC, #9 Proposed Summons as to Poca Valu Rite Pharmacy LLC, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Clinic, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poca Valu Rite Pharmacy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Emerson
Represented By: Debra A. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Burke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Clarkson
Represented By: Thomas W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Jason Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Blume, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inez Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Lanes Family Pharmacy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michelle E. Piziak Gaston
Represented By: James E. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?