Christie et al v. Estate of James Scott Walraven et al
Plaintiff: Robert W. Christie and Amanda Christie
Defendant: Estate of James Scott Walraven, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Columbia Casualty Company, Lockton Affinity, LLC, CNA Group Life Assurance Company, John Doe and/or Jane Doe, Continental Casualty Company, The Continental Corporation and Nova Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01458
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc. to Dismiss #6 Crossclaim and ANSWER TO #6 Crossclaim, by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc. (Moore, W.) (Modified on 1/11/2019 to convert event to motion to dismiss) (kp).
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc. (Moore, W.) (Modified on 1/11/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kp).
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Defendants, Columbia Casualty Company and Continental Casualty Company, Inc., shall file any answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and to Lockton's #6 Cross-claim on or before 1/14/2019 by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Robert W. Christie, Amanda Christie, Lockton Affinity, LLC. (Klein, Karen) (Modified on 1/4/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kp).
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Lockton Affinity, LLC to the Court's #19 Order. (George, Edward)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing Lockton Affinity, LLC to file a response to the #17 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal on or before 12/31/2018, indicating whether it consents to the dismissal of Nova Casualty Company. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/18/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion to Continue Deadlines; the #7 Order and Notice is modified as follows: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/14/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/24/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/31/2019. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 p.m. on 2/8/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/14/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/18/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Nova Casualty Company With Prejudice by Robert W. Christie, Nova Casualty Company pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Stealey, James) (Modified on 12/17/2018 to add party filer)(ts).
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Robert W. Christie, Amanda Christie, Lockton Affinity, LLC, Nova Casualty Company to Continue Deadlines re: #7 Order and Notice. (Moore, W.) (Modified on 12/17/2018 to add party filers) (kp).
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Defendants Columbia Casualty Company and Continental Casualty Company, Inc., shall file any answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint Attached to the #1 Notice of Removal on or before 1/7/2019 by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Robert W. Christie, Amanda Christie, Lockton Affinity, LLC. (Moore, W.) (Modified on 12/14/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kp).
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION The time for Nova Casualty Company, Continental Casual Company, Inc., and Columbia Casualty Company to respond to the Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal is extended to 12/17/2018 by Nova Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Columbia Casualty Company, Robert W. Christie, Amanda Christie. (Walling, Sarah) (Modified on 12/10/2018 to add party filers) (kp).
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert W. Christie in response to #4 MOTION by Lockton Affinity, LLC to Dismiss Complaint (Wiseman, Todd)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Nova Casualty Company to Respond to Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal to December 10, 2018 by Nova Casualty Company, Robert W. Christie, Amanda Christie (Walling, Sarah) (Modified on 12/3/2018 to add party filers)(ts).
November 28, 2018 SET ANSWER DEADLINES for Columbia Casualty Company and Continental Casualty Company, Inc. to 12/10/2018. (kp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Continental Casualty Company, Inc. (Moore, W.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Columbia Casualty Company (Moore, W.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Columbia Casualty Company and Continental Casualty Company, Inc., shall file any answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal on or before 12/10/2018 by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Robert W. Christie, Amanda Christie (Moore, W.) (Modified on 11/29/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kp).
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Nova Casualty Company to Respond to Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal to December 3, 2018 by Nova Casualty Company, Robert W. Christie, Amanda Christie (Walling, Sarah) (Modified on 11/28/2018 to add party filers) (ts).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/17/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/27/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/3/2019. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 p.m. on 1/11/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 1/17/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/27/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lockton Affinity, LLC and CROSSCLAIM by Lockton Affinity, LLC against Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., John Doe and/or Jane Doe, Nova Casualty Company, James Scott Walraven. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (George, Edward) (Modified on 11/27/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Lockton Affinity, LLC in support of #4 MOTION by Lockton Affinity, LLC to Dismiss Complaint. (George, Edward)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Lockton Affinity, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached #1 Notice of Removal. (George, Edward) (Modified on 11/27/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 19, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 PROOF OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal. (taq)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wood County Circuit County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6964987. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christie et al v. Estate of James Scott Walraven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Christie
Represented By: Todd S. Wiseman
Represented By: James I. Stealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Christie
Represented By: Todd S. Wiseman
Represented By: James I. Stealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of James Scott Walraven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company, Inc.
Represented By: Karen E. Klein
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Casualty Company
Represented By: Karen E. Klein
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockton Affinity, LLC
Represented By: Richard N. Beaver
Represented By: Jacob C. Altmeyer
Represented By: Edward M. George, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Group Life Assurance Company
Represented By: Karen E. Klein
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe and/or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Karen E. Klein
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Continental Corporation
Represented By: Karen E. Klein
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Casualty Company
Represented By: Sarah A. Walling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?