Massey v. Hospital Development Co. et al
Plaintiff: Mariana G. Massey
Defendant: Hospital Development Co., Douglas E. Bentz and Jeffrey B. Hunt
Case Number: 2:2018cv01506
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/21/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/7/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/14/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 3/28/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/2/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/9/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/1/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Douglas E. Bentz, Hospital Development Co., Jeffrey B. Hunt.(Presley, Marla)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S #1 COMPLAINT to 1/31/2019 by Douglas E. Bentz, Hospital Development Co., Jeffrey B. Hunt, Mariana G. Massey. (Presley, Marla) (Modified on 1/9/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kp).
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 12/12/2018 as to Hospital Development Co. re: #1 Complaint. (ts)
December 11, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Douglas E. Bentz, Hospital Development Co., Jeffrey B. Hunt, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Jeffrey B. Hunt, #2 Summons as to Douglas E. Bentz) (kp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Mariana G. Massey for Douglas E. Bentz, Hospital Development Co., Jeffrey B. Hunt, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to Jeffrey B. Hunt, #2 Summons submitted as to Douglas E. Bentz) (kp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6992104. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. Hospital Development Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana G. Massey
Represented By: Mark Goldner
Represented By: Maria W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Development Co.
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas E. Bentz
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Hunt
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?