French et al v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Annamarie K. French and Russell Smith, Jr.
Defendant: William Wesley Williams and XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01544
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Robert A. Campbell substituting within-firm representation for Robert D. Cline, Jr. and Jennifer D. Roush on behalf of Annamarie K. French, Russell Smith, Jr. (Campbell, Robert)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/13/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/25/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/4/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 3/8/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/18/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by William Wesley Williams, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Gandee, Stephen) (Modified on 1/24/2019 to add jury demand) (kp).
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/2/2019 as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Registered Agent Solutions, Inc.). (taq)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/2/2019 as to William Wesley Williams. (taq)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/2/2019 as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (taq)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kp)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Annamarie K. French, Russell Smith, Jr. for XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Campbell, Robert) (Modified on 12/28/2018 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., William Wesley Williams, re: #1 Complaint for Damages. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons issued as to William Wesley Williams) (taq)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
December 26, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from R. Sean McEvoy on behalf of Annamarie K. French, Russell Smith, Jr. and Designation of Local Counsel: Robert A. Campbell. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7006556. (originally filed in shell case) (taq)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Joseph A. Fried on behalf of Annamarie K. French, Russell Smith, Jr. and Designation of Local Counsel: Robert A. Campbell. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7006527. (originally filed in shell case) (taq)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7006342. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., #2 Summons submitted as to William Wesley Williams, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French et al v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wesley Williams
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamarie K. French
Represented By: Jennifer D. Roush
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: R. Chad Duffield
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Represented By: R. Sean McEvoy
Represented By: Joseph A. Fried
Represented By: Stephen B. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer D. Roush
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: R. Chad Duffield
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Represented By: R. Sean McEvoy
Represented By: Joseph A. Fried
Represented By: Stephen B. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?