Britton v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company

Plaintiff: Carlton L. Britton
Defendant: E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00009
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 CONFIRMATION from Southern District of Ohio that the case has been opened in that district as 2:19-cv-00009, filed 1/18/2019. (ts)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-109) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Southern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/SDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 1/15/2018. (cc: attys) (kp)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-109), MDL 2433. (kp)
January 4, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (ts)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED for E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company re: #1 Complaint. (ts)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7012672. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britton v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton L. Britton
Represented By: Larry A. Winter
Represented By: R. Edison Hill
Represented By: Harry G. Deitzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?