Hyre v. CRC Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Hyre
Defendant: E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, CRC Industries, Inc., Radiator Specialty Company, Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. and United States Steel Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00018
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/18/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/1/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/8/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 p.m. on 4/12/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/17/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Monica S. Walaan on behalf of Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. (Walaan, Monica)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Radiator Specialty Company (Victorson, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of Answer by Radiator Specialty Company (Attachment: #1 Answer)(Victorson, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant CRC Industries, Inc. (Terek, Christina)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant United States Steel Corporation (Pentino, Denise)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. (Walaan, Monica)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Kinney, Clifford)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Eck on behalf of Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. (Eck, Mark)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company in support of #6 MOTION by E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company to Dismiss Complaint. (Kinney, Clifford)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Kinney, Clifford)
January 7, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRC Industries, Inc. (Terek, Christina) (Modified on 1/8/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Steel Corporation. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pentino, Denise) (Modified on 1/8/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. (Walaan, Monica)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., CRC Industries, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7014593. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyre v. CRC Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Clifford F. Kinney, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria Bittorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christina S. Terek
Represented By: Matthew P. Heiskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiator Specialty Company
Represented By: Sarah A. Phipps
Represented By: Michael B. Victorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Monica S. Walaan
Represented By: Mark A. Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Denise D. Pentino
Represented By: Kyle Turnbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hyre
Represented By: Leif J. Ocheltree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?