United States of America v. $18,910 United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $18,910 United States Currency, $15,440 United States Currency, One 1 oz. Gold Coin, Two 1 oz. Silver Bullets, Fifty 1/10 oz. Silver Coins, Five 5 Ounces of Small Silver Coins, One 5 oz. Gold Bar and Eighty 1 oz. Silver Coins
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture. (Arthur, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur, re: #5 Amended Verified Complaint of Forfeiture. (taq)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (Arthur, Christopher) (Modified on 3/1/2019 to convert event to warrant of arrest and notice in rem submitted) (kp).
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE by United States of America (Arthur, Christopher) (Modified on 2/22/2019 to convert event to complaint - amended) (kp).
January 11, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice of REM Issued. ERROR: Image incorrectly certified. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur. (kp) (Modified on 1/11/2019 to replace image)(ts).
January 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (kp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE by United States of America against $15,440 United States Currency, $18,910 United States Currency, Eighty 1 oz. Silver Coins, Five 5 Ounces of Small Silver Coins, One 1 oz. Gold Coin, One 5 oz. Gold Bar, Two 1 oz. Silver Bullets. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $18,910 United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,910 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,440 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 1 oz. Gold Coin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two 1 oz. Silver Bullets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifty 1/10 oz. Silver Coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five 5 Ounces of Small Silver Coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 5 oz. Gold Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighty 1 oz. Silver Coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?