Hughes et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Leigh Hughes and Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Defendant: United States of America and State of West Virginia
Petitioner: Tanya S. Thorson, Jessica Nicole Thompson, Rebecca S. Pierson, Robin Rae Kelly, Jacqueline A. Schneider, Melissa Jane Bazzy, Sharla Wilton, Cindy Colbert-Hock, Jeffrey A. Thorson, Peter M. Drea, Karin Tang, Shanna Parlock, Douglas W. McLaughlin, Starr Laine Hughes Lowe, Kim Dankovich-Taylor, Julie A. Drea, Rhonda T. Favero, Mark Argo, Kathy Spain, Stanley Dawidowicz, Lawrence L. Favero, Jeffrey F. Knirk, Sr., Jason Matthew Lowe, Patricia Y. Yost, Gail F. McLaughlin, Kristi Becker, Stephanie Lobignat, Pamela Molnar and Kevin J. Tank
Case Number: 2:2019cv00037
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION by Peter M. Drea to Join #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (kp)
March 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION by Julie A. Drea to Join #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (kp)
March 4, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Stanley Dawidowicz to Join #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (kp)
March 4, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Karin Tang to Join #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (kp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Robin Rae Kelly to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Pam Molnar to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Jason Matthew Lowe to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Starr Laine Hughes Lowe to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Mark Argo to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Melissa Jane Bazzy to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 7, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Rebecca S. Pierson to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 6, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Patricia Y. Yost to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 6, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Jessica Nicole Thompson to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Douglas W. McLaughlin to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Gail F. McLaughlin to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Tanya S. Thorson to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Jeffrey A. Thorson to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 4, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by State of West Virginia in support of #18 MOTION by State of West Virginia to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Viglianco, Zachary)
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by State of West Virginia to Dismiss #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (Viglianco, Zachary) (Modified on 2/5/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Kevin J. Tank to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Jeffrey F. Knirk, Sr. to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Jacqueline A. Schneider to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Cindy Colbert-Hock to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for United States of America, as to U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. United States of America served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (taq)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Patrick Morrisey, State of West Virginia, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Ronald J. Kushner. State of West Virginia served on 1/14/2019 (usps.com). (taq)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Stephanie Lobignat to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Shanna Parlock to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Sharla Wilton to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Lawrence L. Favero to join re: #1 Complaint Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Rhonda T. Favero to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Kathy Spain to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Kristi Becker to join re: #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Kim Dankovich-Taylor to join re: #1 Complaint Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Douglas Leigh Hughes, Karen Diann Davis Hughes for United States of America, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 60 days. Original Summons and 2 copies returned to plaintiffs for service. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summons as to U.S. Attorney General) (taq)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # CHAR015355. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (form), #3 Receipt) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Leigh Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Paul Anthony Martin
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Represented By: Curtis R. Capehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanya S. Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Nicole Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rebecca S. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robin Rae Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacqueline A. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melissa Jane Bazzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sharla Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cindy Colbert-Hock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey A. Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter M. Drea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karin Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shanna Parlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas W. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Starr Laine Hughes Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kim Dankovich-Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julie A. Drea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhonda T. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Argo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathy Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Dawidowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence L. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey F. Knirk, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Matthew Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patricia Y. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gail F. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristi Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephanie Lobignat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela Molnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin J. Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?