Gum v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Gum
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc., Sam's East, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Sam's Club and John Doe 1
Case Number: 2:2019cv00065
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. for First Set of Combined Discovery to Plaintiff. (Noel, Heather)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. for First Set of Combined Discovery to Plaintiff. (Noel, Heather)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #15 Order Modifying Trial Date to counsel of record. (taq)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER MODIFYING TRIAL DATE pursuant to the #11 MOTION to Modify the Trial Date; the Court cancels the scheduled Trial Date of 3/24/2020 and reschedules the same to take place on 3/31/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (taq)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Sanford A. Meizlish on behalf of Darlene Gum. Local counsel: James R. Leach. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7100451. (Leach, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jason C. Cox on behalf of Darlene Gum. Local counsel: James R. Leach. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7100419. (Leach, James)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER Order Modifying Trial Date by Sam's East, Inc. (Noel, Heather)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Sam's East, Inc. to Modify Trial Date (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (Noel, Heather)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The scheduling conference is cancelled; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 5/1/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 10/1/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/16/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 10/16/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 11/1/2019. Discovery to close by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/5/2019, with Responses due by 12/19/2019 and Replies due by 12/26/2019. Settlement Meeting to be held by 2/5/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/12/2020, with responses due by 2/19/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 2/10/2020, and Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 2/17/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Charleston. Proposed Jury Charges due by 3/18/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 p.m. on 3/23/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 3/24/2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/1/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Sam's East, Inc., Darlene Gum. (Noel, Heather) (Modified on 2/28/2019 to add party filer) (kp).
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sam's East, Inc. (Noel, Heather)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Sam's East, Inc. (Noel, Heather) (Modified on 2/4/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kp).
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #5 Agreed Order Dismissing Certain Parties to counsel of record. (taq)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PARTIES directing that Sam's West Inc., d/b/a Sam's Club, Sam's West Inc., d/b/a Sam's Club, Sam's Club, Walmart, Inc., and Walmart, Inc., are dismissed from this action and shall be deleted from the style of the case; further, it is agreed by the parties that there should only be one Sam's East, Inc. reflected in the style of the case. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (taq)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order Dismissing Certain Parties by Sam's Club, Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Darlene Gum (Noel, Heather) (Modified on 1/30/2019 to add party filer) (kp).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/19/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/28/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/7/2019. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 PM on 3/15/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/21/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
January 25, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Sam's East, Inc., Sam's Club, Sam's East, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wood County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7036972. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gum v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Gum
Represented By: Matthew C. Carlisle
Represented By: Sanford A. Meizlish
Represented By: Jason C. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Sara E. Brown
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Sara E. Brown
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Sara E. Brown
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Club
Represented By: Sara E. Brown
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?