Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC v. Brenemen et al
Plaintiff: Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC
Defendant: John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Deborah Berry and Denise Scalph
Case Number: 2:2019cv00082
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331ij
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION EXTENDING ANSWER DEADLINE re: #1 Verified Complaint by Deborah Berry, John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph, Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC. (Callaghan, Michael) (Modified on 3/4/2019 to add link to #1 verified complaint and to add party filer) (kp).
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC to #16 MOTION by Deborah Berry, John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph for Leave to File Governmental Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Hissam, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Deborah Berry, John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph for Leave to File Governmental Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Sur-Reply in Opposition)(Callaghan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC to #10 Memorandum In Opposition. (Hissam, Michael) (Modified on 2/22/2019 to remove link to #6 motion) (kp).
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Richard C. Larkin on behalf of Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC. Local counsel: Andrew C. Robey. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7081758. (Robey, Andrew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Brandon McGrath on behalf of Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC. Local counsel: Andrew C. Robey. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7081685. (Robey, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction; pursuant to the notice given and upon hearing held; the parties reached the agreements set forth by them on the record of the hearing. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 TRO HEARING held by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 2/14/2019; Court Reporter: Lisa Cook. (tmr)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Deborah Berry, John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph in opposition to #6 MOTION by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Callaghan, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael O. Callaghan on behalf of Deborah Berry, John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph. (Callaghan, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC re: #6 MOTION by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Hissam, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC in support of #6 MOTION by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Hissam, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Hissam, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC (Robey, Andrew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Brenemen, Denise Scalph, Tom Louisos, Deborah Berry, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Denise Scalph, #2 Summons issued as to Tom Louisos, #3 Summons issued as to Deborah Berry) (taq)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 1, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC for John Brenemen, Denise Scalph, Tom Louisos, Deborah Berry, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Scalph, #2 Proposed Summons as to Louisos, #3 Proposed Summons as to Berry) (taq)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7048035. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC v. Brenemen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brenemen
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Louisos
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Berry
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Scalph
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Larkin
Represented By: Jonathan Zak Ritchie
Represented By: V. Brandon McGrath
Represented By: Michael B. Hissam
Represented By: Andrew C. Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?