Miller v. Loughry et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Miller
Defendant: Stephen Fitz, Judge Allen Lougery, Beth Walker, Robert W. Trumble, Robin Davis, Lisa Barrett, Ashley Hunt, Phillip D. Gaujot, Edward Rollo, Michael Palmer, Day Report Officer Westfall, DeAndra Burton, John Preston Bailey, William Pennington, Ms. DeChristopher, Margert Workman and Judge Allen Loughry
Case Number: 2:2019cv00087
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY by DeChristopher, Stephen Fitz, Westfall to #13 Response In Opposition. (Greve, Wendy)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Teresa Miller in opposition to #11 MOTION by DeChristopher, Stephen Fitz, Beth Walker to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (taq)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by DeChristopher, Stephen Fitz, Beth Walker in support of #11 MOTION by DeChristopher, Stephen Fitz, Beth Walker to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Greve, Wendy)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by DeChristopher, Stephen Fitz, Beth Walker to Dismiss #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (Greve, Wendy) (Modified on 3/18/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants DeChristopher, Stephen Fitz, Beth Walker (Greve, Wendy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION by Teresa Miller to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Mailing Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER pursuant to the #1 Complaint; directing the plaintiff to either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a properly-completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by 3/15/2019; the docket sheet modified to reflect the correct spelling of the defendant's last name herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/5/2019. (cc: plaintiff, with IFP Application) (taq)
February 5, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the West Virginia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 4, 2019 Case transferred to District of Southern District of West Virginia. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (wrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 2/5/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: It is ORDERED that this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/4/2019. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 2/5/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Internet Crime Complaint filed by Teresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(wrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 2/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Teresa Miller regarding filing fee for #1 Complaint, filed by Teresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved IFP Form)(Mailed via CM, RRR)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 2/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Complaint.(Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 2/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Teresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Letter from US Department of Justice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Allen Lougery, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Beth Walker, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Robin Davis, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Margert Workman, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Phillip D. Gaujot, #7 Civil Cover Sheet John Preston Bailey, #8 Civil Cover Sheet William Pennington, #9 Civil Cover Sheet DeAndra Burton, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Ashley Hunt, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Michael Palmer, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Stephen Fitz, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Edward Rollo, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Lisa Barrett, #15 Envelope)(wrr) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 2/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Loughry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Fitz
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Allen Lougery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Walker
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Trumble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip D. Gaujot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day Report Officer Westfall
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAndra Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Preston Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. DeChristopher
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margert Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Allen Loughry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?