United States of America v. The Sum of $34,510.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Sum of $34,510.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2019cv00093
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Joseph Balenovich on behalf of The Sum of $34,510.00 in United States Currency. (Balenovich, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE with Jury Demand by The Sum of $34,510.00 in United States Currency. (Balenovich, John) (Modified on 4/4/2019 to add jury demand) (kew).
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture and Warrant of Arrest and Notice in Rem. (Arthur, Christopher)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur. (kp)
February 6, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (kp)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE by United States of America against The Sum of $34,510.00 in United States Currency. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Sum of $34,510.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sum of $34,510.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: John Joseph Balenovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?