Hussell et al v. Franklin et al

Petitioner: Alayna Hussell and Joseph Hussell
Respondent: WV Department of Health and Human Resource Bureau for Children and Families, Katie Franklin, Erica Brannon Gunn, Melvin Hill, Betsy Hill, Child Protective Services Jackson County, WV, Robert Boggs, Charles Williams, James Griesacker and Lora Dyer
Case Number: 2:2019cv00101
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: John T Copenhaver
1 Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Joseph Hussell for Appointment of Counsel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 THIRD AMENDED PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF by Joseph Hussell against Robert Boggs, Child Protective Services Jackson County, WV, Katie Franklin, Erica Brannon Gunn, Betsy Hill, Melvin Hill, WV Department of Health and Human Resource Bureau for Children and Families, James Griesacker, Lora Dyer, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Evidence List, #2 19-c-8ab1, 17-JA-74ab2, 19-c-8ab3, #3 19-c-8ab4, #4 17-JA-74ab5 - 17-JA-74ab6, 19-c-8ab7, #5 17-JA-74ab8 - 17-JA-74ab9, 17-JA-74bc10 - 11, #6 17-JA-74bc12 - 17-JA-74bc15, #7 17-JA-74bc16 - 17-JA-74bc19, 17-JA-74cd20 - 21, #8 SCRJ011 - 12, #9 SCRJO14 - 17, #10 DO36 - 37, #11 Mailing Envelope) (taq) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/12/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDMENT TO HABEAS CORPUS by Joseph Hussell re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (taq)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Joseph Hussell against Katie Franklin, WV Department of Health and Human Resource Bureau for Children and Families, Child Protective Services Jackson County, WV, Erica Brannon Gunn, Robert Boggs, Melvin Hill, Betsy Hill, pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)
February 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Alayna Hussell, Joseph Hussell to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussell et al v. Franklin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WV Department of Health and Human Resource Bureau for Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katie Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erica Brannon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melvin Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Betsy Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Child Protective Services Jackson County, WV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Griesacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lora Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alayna Hussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Hussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?