Loved Ones In Home Care, LLC v. Toor et al
Plaintiff: Loved Ones In Home Care, LLC
Defendant: Mark Toor, Linda Harris, Sonya Shaffer, Betsy Farnsworth, Peggy Harper and Bonnie Newman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00134
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 77:7777
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Loved Ones In Home Care, LLC to Dismiss Defendant Bonnie Newman. (Neely, Richard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending the time for the Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint to 05/01/2019 by Mark Toor Loved Ones In Home Care, LLC. (Ramey, Ancil) (Modified on 3/5/2019 to add party filer) (kp).
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Sonya Shaffer. Sonya Shaffer served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Summons served on Joseph Shaffer/Husband. (Neely, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Peggy Harper. Peggy Harper served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. Summons served on Peggy Harper. (Neely, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Mark Toor. Mark Toor served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Summons served on Mark Toor. (Neely, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Linda Harris. Linda Harris served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Summons served on Linda Harris. (Neely, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Bonnie Newman. Bonnie Newman served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Summons served on Bonnie Newman. (Neely, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Betsy Farnsworth. Betsy Farnsworth served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. Summons served on Betsy Farnsworth. (Neely, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Betsy Farnsworth, Peggy Harper, Linda Harris, Bonnie Newman, Sonya Shaffer, Mark Toor, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Bonnie Newman, #2 Summons as to Linda Harris, #3 Summons as to Mark Toor, #4 Summons as to Peggy Harper, #5 Summons as to Sonya Shaffer) (kp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED as to Mark Toor, Betsy Farnsworth, Linda Harris, Sonya Shaffer, Bonnie Newman, Peggy Harper, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Betsy Farnsworth, #2 Summons issued as to Linda Harris, #3 Summons issued as to Sonya Shaffer, #4 Summons issued as to Bonnie Newman, #5 Summons issued as to Peggy Harper) (taq)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS TO BE REISSUED SUBMITTED by Loved Ones In Home Care, LLC for Betsy Farnsworth, Peggy Harper, Linda Harris, Bonnie Newman, Sonya Shaffer, Mark Toor, re: #1 Complaint. (Neely, Richard) (Modified on 2/26/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kp).
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Toor, Betsy Farnsworth, Sonya Shaffer, Bonnie Newman, Peggy Harper, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Betsy Farnsworth, #2 Summons issued as to Sonya Shaffer, #3 Summons issued as to Bonnie Newman, #4 Summons issued as to Peggy Harper) (taq)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 25, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7087616. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loved Ones In Home Care, LLC v. Toor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Toor
Represented By: Ancil G. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loved Ones In Home Care, LLC
Represented By: Charles Whittaker Neely
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Represented By: Richard Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?