Cunningham Energy, LLC v. Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Cunningham Energy, LLC and Cunningham Lease Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant: Rick Cott, Vesta VFO, LLC, Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC and Joshua William Coleman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00385
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by Cunningham Energy, LLC, Cunningham Lease Acquisitions, LLC to #14 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Webb, Kenneth)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/18/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/29/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/5/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 AM on 8/9/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/19/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/27/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/28/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (ts)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Joshua William Coleman, Rick Cott, Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, Vesta VFO, LLC in opposition to #8 MOTION by Cunningham Energy, LLC for Preliminary Injunction (Zurbuch, Alex) (Modified on 6/28/2019 to remove link to #9 memorandum) (kew).
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint, by Joshua William Coleman, Rick Cott, Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, Vesta VFO, LLC.(Zurbuch, Alex)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO #8 MOTION by Cunningham Energy, LLC for Preliminary Injunction to 6/27/2019 by Joshua William Coleman, Rick Cott, Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, Vesta VFO, LLC, Cunningham Energy, LLC, Cunningham Lease Acquisitions, LLC. (Tully, Jared) (Modified on 6/21/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared M. Tully on behalf of Joshua William Coleman, Rick Cott, Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, Vesta VFO, LLC. (Tully, Jared)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' #1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT to 6/27/2019 by Joshua William Coleman, Rick Cott, Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, Vesta VFO, LLC, Cunningham Energy, LLC, Cunningham Lease Acquisitions, LLC. (Zurbuch, Alex) (Modified on 6/13/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filers) (kew).
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Cunningham Energy, LLC in support of #8 MOTION by Cunningham Energy, LLC for Preliminary Injunction (Webb, Kenneth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Cunningham Energy, LLC for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Webb, Kenneth)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/22/2019 as to Joshua William Coleman. (kew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/22/2019 as to Rick Cott. (kew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/22/2019 as to Vesta VFO, LLC. (kew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/22/2019 as to Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC. (kew)
May 15, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua William Coleman, Rick Cott, Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, Vesta VFO, LLC, re: #1 Verified Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Vesta VFO, #2 Summons issued as to Rick Cott, #3 Summons issued as to Joshua Coleman) (lca)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7235684. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Vesta O&G, #3 Proposed Summons for Vesta VFO, #4 Proposed Summons for Cott, #5 Proposed Summons for Coleman) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham Energy, LLC v. Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Cott
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta VFO, LLC
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta O & G Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua William Coleman
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cunningham Energy, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E. Webb, Jr.
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Represented By: Marc A. Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cunningham Lease Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E. Webb, Jr.
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Represented By: Marc A. Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?