Young v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Plaintiff: James J. Young
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00402
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled. This case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/9/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 12/23/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/9/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/8/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/24/2020. Discovery to close by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/27/2020, with Responses due by 3/12/2020, and Replies due by 3/19/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 4/29/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/6/2020, with responses due by 5/13/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/4/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 6/10/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 6/15/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 6/16/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/12/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Wells Fargo Bank, NA, James J. Young. (Patterson, Matthew) (Modified on 7/9/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/19/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/1/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/8/2019. Scheduling Conference at 09:30 AM on 7/15/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/22/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 7/29/2019 Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/31/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Patterson, Matthew) (Modified on 5/28/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
May 23, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (kew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, NA with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7249052. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Young
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Matthew D. Patterson
Represented By: James Houston Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?