Slone v. State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Patty Slone
Defendant: Sheri Lenthe, Joe Mask and State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00408
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The scheduling conference is cancelled; this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 1/7/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/23/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/22/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 2/7/2020. Discovery to close by 2/21/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 3/12/2020, Responses due by 3/26/2020 Replies due by 4/2/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 5/13/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/20/2020, with responses due by 5/27/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/18/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2020 1:30 PM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 6/24/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 7/6/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/9/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (ts)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Sheri Lenthe, Joe Mask, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Patty Slone. (Subacz, Allison) (Modified on 7/7/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY by Sheri Lenthe, Joe Mask, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to #6 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5)(Subacz, Allison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Patty Slone in opposition to #3 MOTION by Sheri Lenthe, Joe Mask, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kaminski, Scott)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/20/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/1/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/8/2019. Scheduling Conference at 02:30 PM on 7/12/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/22/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 7/30/2019 Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/31/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Sheri Lenthe, Joe Mask, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company in support of #3 MOTION by Sheri Lenthe, Joe Mask, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment. (Subacz, Allison)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Sheri Lenthe, Joe Mask, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Subacz, Allison)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Original images contained incorrect file stamp headers. CORRECTION: Images removed and replaced with correct images. (mek)
May 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joe Mask, Sheri Lenthe, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company with summonses, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7251585. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Misc Documents, #3 State Court Complaint and Summonses, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mek) (Modified on 5/28/2019 to remove and replace images with incorrect headers) (mek).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slone v. State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Lenthe
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Mask
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Slone
Represented By: Scott H. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?