Duty v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Brian Duty
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00428
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 77:7777
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia, of receipt of case file on 6/21/2019. (ts)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER to Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, from Rory L. Perry, Clerk dated 6/18/2019, re: transmitting case file pursuant to the Court's #8 Order. (lca)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting defendant's request to withdraw its notice of removal and remands this case to the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia. Directing the Clerk to remove this matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/18/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Petition for Removal by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Thompson, Chelsea)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP for Expert Witness Disclosure. (Thompson, Chelsea)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Kinder, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/8/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/16/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 02:30 PM on 7/23/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/29/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/6/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/10/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Thompson, Chelsea)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 4, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #BWVSDC-7265291. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certified Docket Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duty v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Duty
Represented By: Phillip D. Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Eric E. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?