Stogsdill v. Spears et al

Plaintiff: Summer McKinley Stogsdill
Defendant: James Spears and Kens Towing & Service, LLC
Not Yet Classified: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00440
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/3/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/12/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 9/19/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/26/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND APPEARANCE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Hughes, Benjamin) (Modified on 7/18/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to correct party filer) (kew).
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY by Summer McKinley Stogsdill to #8 Brief In Opposition. (Ferrell, Joshua)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF by Kens Towing & Service, LLC, James Spears in opposition to #3 MOTION by Summer McKinley Stogsdill to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Boone County. (Lamperski, Vincent) (Modified on 7/2/2019 to remove link to #4 memorandum) (kew).
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Kens Towing & Service, LLC (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Spears. (Lamperski, Vincent) (Modified on 6/18/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Kens Towing & Service, LLC. (Lamperski, Vincent) (Modified on 6/18/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kew).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM by Summer McKinley Stogsdill in support of #3 MOTION by Summer McKinley Stogsdill to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Boone County (Ferrell, Joshua)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Summer McKinley Stogsdill to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Boone County (Ferrell, Joshua)
June 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kens Towing & Service, LLC, James Spears with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Boone County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7273821. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stogsdill v. Spears et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer McKinley Stogsdill
Represented By: Joshua Seth Ferrell
Represented By: Nathan D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Spears
Represented By: Jon B. Orndorff
Represented By: Vincent Paul Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kens Towing & Service, LLC
Represented By: Jon B. Orndorff
Represented By: Vincent Paul Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin T. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?