Blanks et al v. McGuire Lumber and Supply, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Che Blanks and Mariel Blanks
Defendant: McGuire Lumber and Supply, Inc., Canada Trucking LLC and Tina Grissom Evans
Case Number: 2:2019cv00448
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 9/20/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 1/14/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/30/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/29/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 2/14/2020. Discovery to close by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 3/19/2020, with Responses due by 4/2/2020, and Replies due by 4/9/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 5/20/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/27/2020, with responses due by 6/3/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/25/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 7/1/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 7/13/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 7/14/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by McGuire Lumber and Supply, Inc., Tina Grissom Evans, Canada Trucking LLC, Mariel Blanks, Che Blanks. (Montgomery, Timothy) (Modified on 7/23/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Teena Y. Miller updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Che Blanks, Mariel Blanks. (Miller, Teena)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Canada Trucking LLC (Montgomery, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McGuire Lumber and Supply, Inc. (Montgomery, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Canada Trucking LLC. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Montgomery, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/18/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/25/2019. Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 8/2/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/9/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/19/2019 Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
June 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mariel Blanks, Che Blanks with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7277854. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanks et al v. McGuire Lumber and Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGuire Lumber and Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canada Trucking LLC
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Grissom Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Che Blanks
Represented By: Teena Y. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariel Blanks
Represented By: Teena Y. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?