Chau et al v. Air Cargo Carriers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anh Kim Ho and Virginia Chau
Defendant: Jonathan Pablo Alvarado, Sheriff of Kanawha County, United Parcel Service Co., Air Cargo Carriers, LLC and UPS Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00452
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to #19 Response In Opposition. (Tiano, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to #17 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (Tiano, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Air Cargo Carriers, LLC in opposition to #9 MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County and #15 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County, JOINDER in #17 Response in Opposition and OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Requested Conditional Discovery re: #15 Supplemental Motion. (Poe, Edgar) (Modified on 7/30/2019 to correct links) (kew).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/3/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/12/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 9/19/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/26/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE by United Parcel Service Co. in opposition to #9 MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County and #15 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Moore, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho in support of #15 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Tiano, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Tiano, William)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot the #8 MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Remand in response to Notice of Removal; however, the motion is GRANTED insofar as it seeks to supplement the motion to remand within the original 30-day deadline; directing the Plaintiff to file a memorandum of law and any additional exhibits in support of her motion to remand no later than 7/15/2019; Defendants will have fourteen days from the date of Plaintiff's supplemental filings to respond to the motion. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/9/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Thomas B. Almy on behalf of Air Cargo Carriers, LLC. Local counsel: Brian J. Moore. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7309154. (Moore, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to #10 Response In Opposition,. (Tiano, William)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 JOINDER by Air Cargo Carriers, LLC in the #10 Response In Opposition. (Poe, Edgar) (Modified on 7/2/2019 to convert event to notice (other)) (kew).
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by United Parcel Service Co. in opposition to #8 MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Remand in response to #1 Notice of Removal and #9 MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Moore, Brian) (Modified on 7/1/2019 to add link to #9 motion) (kew).
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Tiano, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Virginia Chau, Anh Kim Ho for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Remand in response to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tiano, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service Co. (Moore, Brian) (Modified on 6/20/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Air Cargo Carriers, LLC (Poe, Edgar)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Air Cargo Carriers, LLC (Poe, Edgar)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Air Cargo Carriers, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poe, Edgar)
June 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant United Parcel Service Co. (Moore, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service Co. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7281292. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chau et al v. Air Cargo Carriers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anh Kim Ho
Represented By: William M. Tiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Chau
Represented By: William M. Tiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Pablo Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Kanawha County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Co.
Represented By: Kelsey Haught Parsons
Represented By: Brian J. Moore
Represented By: Thomas B. Almy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Cargo Carriers, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Moore
Represented By: Edgar A. Poe, Jr.
Represented By: Adam B. Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?