Gamble v. New River Adventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cherie Gamble
Defendant: New River Adventures, Inc. and Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00453
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Z. Hall on behalf of Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc., New River Adventures, Inc. (Hall, Sharon)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/3/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/12/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 9/19/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/26/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherie Gamble for First Amended Complaint. (Wood, Henry)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Cherie Gamble in support of #9 MOTION by Cherie Gamble to Amend #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Wood, Henry) (Modified on 7/19/2019 to remove link to #8 memorandum in opposition) (kew).
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Cherie Gamble to Amend #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Wood, Henry) (Modified on 7/19/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cherie Gamble in opposition to #4 MOTION by Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc., New River Adventures, Inc. to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wood, Henry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for New River Adventures, Inc. New River Adventures, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. Summons served on Peggy Blankenship, Office Manager. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Wood, Henry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc.. Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. Summons served on Peggy Blankenship, Office Manager. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Wood, Henry) (Modified on 7/12/2019 to add answer date) (kew).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc., New River Adventures, Inc. in support of #4 MOTION by Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc., New River Adventures, Inc. to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Rhodes, Macel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc., New River Adventures, Inc. to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Rhodes, Macel) (Modified on 7/11/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc., New River Adventures, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons Issued for Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc.) (lca)
June 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # CHAR015989. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt, #3 Proposed Summons for New River Adventures, #4 Proposed Summons for Autumn Breeze Farms) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. New River Adventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Gamble
Represented By: Henry E. Wood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New River Adventures, Inc.
Represented By: Macel E. Rhodes
Represented By: Sharon Z. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn Breeze Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Macel E. Rhodes
Represented By: Sharon Z. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?