Cross v. Surge Staffing, LLC
Plaintiff: Susan Cross
Defendant: Surge Staffing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00455
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled. This case shall proceed as follows: Plaintiff's Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 09/02/2019. Defendant's Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 10/01/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 05/05/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 04/20/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 05/20/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 06/05/2020. Discovery to close by 06/19/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 07/09/2020, with Responses due by 07/23/2020, and Replies due by 07/30/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 09/09/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 09/16/2020, with responses due by 09/23/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 09/14/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 09/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 09/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 10/21/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 10/26/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 10/27/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Surge Staffing, LLC, Susan Cross. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Weber, Constance) (Modified on 7/23/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Surge Staffing, LLC. (Weber, Constance)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/18/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/25/2019. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 PM on 8/2/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/8/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/19/2019 Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 14, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Surge Staffing, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Wood County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7282151. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Surge Staffing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surge Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Burns
Represented By: Constance H. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cross
Represented By: Walt Auvil
Represented By: Kirk Auvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?