Bygum et al v. The City of Montgomery et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Bygum and Eric Michell Young
Defendant: The City of Montgomery, Roger L. King and The Montgomery Policy Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv00456
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Deborah Bygum, Eric Michell Young in opposition to #5 MOTION by Montgomery Policy Department, The City of Montgomery to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Williams, Russell) (Modified on 8/8/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/26/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/5/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/12/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 9/20/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/26/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (ts)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Roger L. King in support of #7 PARTIAL MOTION by Roger L. King to Dismiss Count II of the #1 Complaint. (Taylor, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 PARTIAL MOTION by Roger L. King to Dismiss Count II of the #1 Complaint. (Taylor, Michael) (Modified on 8/5/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Montgomery Policy Department, The City of Montgomery in support of #5 MOTION by Montgomery Policy Department, The City of Montgomery to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Taylor, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Montgomery Policy Department, The City of Montgomery to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Taylor, Michael) (Modified on 8/5/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Roger L. King. (Taylor, Michael) (Modified on 8/5/2019 to add jury demand) (kew).
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roger L. King, Montgomery Policy Department, The City of Montgomery, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Roger L. King, #2 Summons as to Montgomery Police Department) (ts)
June 14, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7282716. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to City of Montgomery, #3 Summons as to Montgomery Police Department, #4 Summons as to Roger King) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bygum et al v. The City of Montgomery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bygum
Represented By: Russell A. Williams
Represented By: Truman C. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Michell Young
Represented By: Russell A. Williams
Represented By: Truman C. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Montgomery
Represented By: Charles R. Bailey
Represented By: Michael W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger L. King
Represented By: Charles R. Bailey
Represented By: Michael W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Montgomery Policy Department
Represented By: Charles R. Bailey
Represented By: Michael W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?