McGuire et al v. Beaman et al
Plaintiff: Judith McGuire and James McGuire
Defendant: Joseph Beaman and Erica N. Shaffer
Case Number: 2:2019cv00469
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference previously scheduled for 8/30/2019 be cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 9/30/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 2/14/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 1/30/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 3/2/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/16/2020. Deposition deadline and close of discovery by 3/30/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 4/20/2020, with responses due by 5/4/2020, and replies due by 5/11/2020. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 6/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Mediation to be concluded by 6/22/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 6/22/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/29/2020, with responses due by 7/6/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 6/24/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Proposed jury instructions due by 7/27/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:00 AM on 8/3/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 8/4/2020 at 8:30 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Joseph Beaman, Erica N. Shaffer, Judith McGuire, James McGuire. (Brison, M.) (Modified on 7/26/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/29/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/2/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/16/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 8/30/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/11/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/8/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (ts)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Joseph Beaman, Erica N. Shaffer. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brison, M.) (Modified on 7/7/2019 to add jury demand) (kew).
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Joseph Beaman, Erica N. Shaffer, re: #1 Complaint. Served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Return Receipts)(Farrell, Joseph) (Modified on 7/3/2019 to correct link) (kew).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Beaman, Erica N. Shaffer re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Joseph Beaman) (ts)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
June 19, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7289695. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Joseph M. Beaman and Erica N. Shaffer) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire et al v. Beaman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Beaman
Represented By: M. Andrew Brison
Represented By: Brittany T. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica N. Shaffer
Represented By: M. Andrew Brison
Represented By: Brittany T. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith McGuire
Represented By: Joseph M. Farrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGuire
Represented By: Joseph M. Farrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?