Hyre v. CRC Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Hyre
Defendant: CRC Industries, Inc. and Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00505
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant CRC Industries, Inc. (Terek, Christina)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/9/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/23/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/30/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 10/3/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/9/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. (Bordogna, Mario)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by CRC Industries, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Terek, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. (Bordogna, Mario) (Modified on 8/9/2019 to add jury demand) (kew).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRC Industries, Inc., Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Safety-Kleen) (ts)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
July 9, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7312180. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons for Safety-Kleen) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyre v. CRC Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hyre
Represented By: Leif J. Ocheltree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christina S. Terek
Represented By: Matthew P. Heiskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Mario R. Bordogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?