Meadows et al v. Krayem et al

Plaintiff: Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith, Jessica Abshire and Heather Adkins
Defendant: AM & GH LLC, Sana Said Suliman, KAL PRO LLC, K STAR LLC, Ammar Krayem and Adham Kalou
Case Number: 2:2019cv00525
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J. LaFon on behalf of KAL PRO LLC, Adham Kalou, Sana Said Suliman. (LaFon, Timothy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against K STAR LLC (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against AM & GH LLC (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 36 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AM & GH LLC dba Grano and K STAR LLC pursuant to Rule 55(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (cc: counsel of record; defendants via certified mail). (Attachment: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (ts)
August 26, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re: #1 Complaint as to AM & GH LLC; answer due 8/15/2019. (ts)
August 23, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S ORDER. For reasons appearing to the court, this action is hereby REASSIGNED from Judge Joseph R. Goodwin to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 08/23/2019. (cc: Judge Goodwin; Judge Johnston; counsel of record). (klc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE by KAL PRO LLC, Adham Kalou, Sana Said Suliman in opposition to #30 MOTION by Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against KAL PRO LLC, #31 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against Adham Kalou, and #32 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default by Clerk against Sana Said Suliman. (Lindroth, Richard) (Modified on 8/26/2019 to remove links to #11, #13, #14, and #15) (kew).
August 23, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Default Judgment by the Court against Sana Said Suliman (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.) (Modified on 8/26/2019 to convert event to motion for judgment by court) (ts).
August 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #29 Motion by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against Ammar Krayem, and #30 Motion by Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against KAL PRO LLC. ERROR: Proposed Order inadvertently attached. CORRECTION: Proposed orders removed. (ts)
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against Adham Kalou (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith, Heather Adkins, Jessica Abshire for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against KAL PRO LLC (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.) (Modified on 8/23/2019 to remove attachment #2 proposed order and to add party filers) (ts).
August 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against Ammar Krayem (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.) (Modified on 8/23/2019 to remove attachment #2 proposed order) (ts).
August 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith for Entry of Default by Clerk against K STAR LLC (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith, Heather Adkins, Jessica Abshire for Entry of Default by Clerk against AM & GH LLC (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.) (Modified on 8/26/2019 to add party filers)(ts).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER For reasons appearing to the court, this action is ORDERED TRANSFERRED to the Clerk of the Court, for reassignment to another judge within this district. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER to USDC Clerk's Office, from Hayla Krayem dated 8/2019 re: certified mail received on 8/20/2019 for Ammar Krayem. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (ts)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Ammar Krayem re: #22 Clerk's Entry of Default. (ts)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from KAL PRO LLC re: #13 Clerk's Entry of Default. (kew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ammar Krayem. (cc: counsel of record; defendants) (Attachment: #1 Certified Return Receipt) (kew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #19 Order to counsel of record and defendants. (kew)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/5/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/18/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/25/2019. Scheduling Conference at 09:00 AM on 10/9/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/14/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mms)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against the defendant Ammar Krayem; counsel for the plaintiffs is directed to file the appropriate motion and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2019. (cc: counsel of record; defendants) (kew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Jessica Abshire, Heather Adkins, Malena Meadows, Leslie Smith in support of #14 MOTION by KAL PRO LLC, Adham Kalou, Sana Said Suliman to Set Aside Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ranson, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Adham Kalou re: #13 Clerk's Entry of Default. (ts)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Sana Said Suliman re: #13 Clerk's Entry of Default. (ts)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT by KAL PRO LLC, Adham Kalou, Sana Said Suliman and CROSSCLAIM by KAL PRO LLC, Adham Kalou, Sana Said Suliman against AM & GH LLC, K STAR LLC, Ammar Krayem. (Lindroth, Richard) (Modified on 8/15/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by KAL PRO LLC, Adham Kalou, Sana Said Suliman to Set Aside Default Judgment (Lindroth, Richard)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Clerk's Entry of Default as to KAL PRO LLC, Sana Said Suliman, and Adham Kalou. CORRECTION: Certified Mail Receipts attached. (ts)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KAL PRO LLC, Sana Said Suliman, and Adham Kalou. (cc: counsel of record; KAL PRO LLC, Sana Said Suliman, Adham Kalou, via reg. and cert. mail) (lca) (Additional attachments added on 8/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (ts).
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #11 Order, to attorneys and any unrepresented party. (lca)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) against the Defendants KAL PRO LLC, Sana Said Suliman, and Adham Kalou. Further directing counsel for the plaintiffs to file the appropriate motion and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment within twenty days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/9/2019. (cc: attys; defendants) (lca)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/19/2019 as to KAL PRO LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002553224. (ts)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/19/2019 as to K STAR LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002553217. (ts)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/19/2019 as to AM & GH LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002553200. (ts)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ammar Krayem. Ammar Krayem served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Summons served on Nadine Krayem. (Ranson, J.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for KAL PRO LLC. KAL PRO LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Summons served on Sana Said Suliman. (Ranson, J.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Adham Kalou. Adham Kalou served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Summons served on Sana Said Suliman. (Ranson, J.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Sana Said Suliman. Sana Said Suliman served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Summons served on Sana Said Suliman. (Ranson, J.)
July 17, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AM & GH LLC, K STAR LLC, KAL PRO LLC, Adham Kalou, Ammar Krayem, Sana Said Suliman, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to AM & GH LLC, #2 Summons as to Ammar Krayem, #3 Summons as to K STAR LLC, #4 Summons as to KAL PRO LLC, #5 Summons as to Sana Said Suliman) (kew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7321512. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Summons as to Adham Kalou, #11 Proposed Summons as to AM & GH LLC, #12 Proposed Summons as to Ammar Krayem, #13 Proposed Summons as to K STAR LLC, #14 Proposed Summons as to KAL PRO LLC, #15 Proposed Summons as to Sana Said Suliman, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows et al v. Krayem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM & GH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sana Said Suliman
Represented By: Richard J. Lindroth
Represented By: Timothy J. LaFon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAL PRO LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Lindroth
Represented By: Timothy J. LaFon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K STAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammar Krayem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adham Kalou
Represented By: Richard J. Lindroth
Represented By: Timothy J. LaFon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malena Meadows
Represented By: J. Michael Ranson
Represented By: G. Patrick Jacobs
Represented By: Cynthia M. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Smith
Represented By: J. Michael Ranson
Represented By: G. Patrick Jacobs
Represented By: Cynthia M. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Abshire
Represented By: J. Michael Ranson
Represented By: G. Patrick Jacobs
Represented By: Cynthia M. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Adkins
Represented By: J. Michael Ranson
Represented By: G. Patrick Jacobs
Represented By: Cynthia M. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?