Cox v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Cox
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00542
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 9/20/2019 is CANCELED. This case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 7/17/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 7/6/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 8/5/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 8/21/2020. Discovery to close by 9/18/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 9/24/2020, with responses due by 10/8/2020, and replies due by 10/15/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 11/25/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 12/2/2020, with responses due by 12/9/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 11/30/2020, Integrated Pretrial Order by 12/7/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2021 2:00 PM before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Jury Instructions and Voir Dire by 1/5/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 2:00 PM on 1/4/2021. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by General Motors, LLC, Kenneth Ray Cox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Bird, Melissa) (Modified on 9/17/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/26/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/9/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/16/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 9/20/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/25/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Motors, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7328783. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Motors, LLC. (Bird, Melissa) (Modified on 7/25/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Michael Drury Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Cox
Represented By: Justin Jerome Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?