Blankenship v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Don Blankenship
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive and Donald Trump, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00549
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 10/21/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/14/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/30/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/29/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/15/2020. Discovery to close by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/18/2020, with Responses due by 7/2/2020, and Replies due by 7/9/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 8/19/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 8/26/2020, with responses due by 9/2/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 8/24/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 9/30/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 10/5/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Donald Trump, Jr., Don Blankenship. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 9/16/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Donald Trump, Jr. to #11 Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (Adkins, J.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Don Blankenship in support of opposition to #3 MOTION by Donald Trump, Jr. to Dismiss Complaint (Gray, Jeremy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jeremy Gray on behalf of Don Blankenship. Local counsel: Jeffrey S. Simpkins. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7347649. (Attachment: #1 West Virginia State Bar fees receipt)(Simpkins, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Zachary Gidding on behalf of Don Blankenship. Local counsel: Jeffrey S. Simpkins. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7347611. (Attachment: #1 West Virginia State Bar fees receipt)(Simpkins, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 and #8 NOTICE Statements of Visiting Attorney. ERROR: Incorrect event used. CORRECTION: Images removed. (kew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 8/12/2019 to remove image filed using incorrect event) (kew).
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 8/12/2019 to remove image filed using incorrect event) (kew).
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Notice of Change of Attorney Information. ERROR: Pages omitted. CORRECTION: Pages added and image replaced. (kew)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/27/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/6/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/13/2019. Scheduling Conference at 10:30 AM on 9/20/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/27/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record, any unrepresented parties) (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by J. Mark Adkins for Richard R. Heath, Jr. updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Does 1-50 inclusive, Donald Trump, Jr. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 8/7/2019 to correct and replace incorrect image) (kew).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM by Donald Trump, Jr. in support of #3 MOTION by Donald Trump, Jr. to Dismiss Complaint. (Adkins, J.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Donald Trump, Jr. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 8/5/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
July 26, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Donald Trump, Jr. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7331018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump, Jr.
Represented By: Richard R. Heath, Jr.
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Blankenship
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Simpkins
Represented By: Zachary Austin Gidding
Represented By: Jeremy Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?