Clark v. City of Richwood et al
Plaintiff: Norvill S. Clark
Defendant: The City Council for the City of Richwood, Glen Weiler, Robin Brown, Sherry Chapman, Chris McKenzie, Britt Nicholas, The City of Richwood, James Vannoy, Bob Henry Baber, Ann Spencer, Chris Drennen, Cara Perkins and Chuck Toussieng
Case Number: 2:2019cv00554
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED/REFUSED for Bob Henry Baber re: #1 Complaint. Date Returned Unexecuted: 9/19/2019. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED/REFUSED for Cara Perkins re: #1 Complaint. Date Returned Unexecuted: 9/19/2019. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Robin Brown, Sherry Chapman, City Council for the City of Richwood, City of Richwood, Chris Drennen, Chris McKenzie, Britt Nicholas, Ann Spencer, Chuck Toussieng, James Vannoy, Glen Weiler in opposition to #22 MOTION by Norvill S. Clark to Amend #1 Complaint and to Dismiss Defendants #14 Motion as Moot (Williams, Allison)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing that the #25 Order and Notice entered on 9/12/2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/13/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #26 ORDER ENTERED ON 9/13/219: ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/2/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/14/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/21/2019. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 11/1/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/12/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mms) (Modified on 9/13/2019 to note order has been vacated) (kew).
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vanessa L. Towarnicky on behalf of Robin Brown, Sherry Chapman, City Council for the City of Richwood, City of Richwood, Chris Drennen, Chris McKenzie, Britt Nicholas, Ann Spencer, Chuck Toussieng, James Vannoy, Glen Weiler. (Towarnicky, Vanessa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Norvill S. Clark in support of #22 MOTION by Norvill S. Clark to Amend #1 Complaint and to Dismiss Defendants #14 Motion as Moot. (ts)
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Norvill S. Clark to Amend #1 Complaint and to Dismiss Defendants #14 Motion as Moot. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint with Exhibits) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (ts)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED for Bob Henry Baber re: #1 Complaint. Date Returned Unexecuted: 8/28/2019. (msa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED for Cara Perkins re: #1 Complaint. Date Returned Unexecuted: 8/28/2019. (msa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED for Chris McKenzie re: #1 Complaint. Date Returned Unexecuted: 8/28/2019. (msa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED for Britt Nicholas re: #1 Complaint. Date Returned Unexecuted: 8/28/2019. (msa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS REISSUED by the Clerk for Bob Henry Baber, Cara Perkins re: #1 Complaint, via certified mail, return receipt requested, restricted delivery returnable 21 days. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Caroline Perkins, #2 Certified Mail Receipts) (ts)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Norvill S. Clark for Bob Henry Baber, Cara Perkins, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Caroline Perkins, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Mailing Evelope) (ts)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Robin Brown, Sherry Chapman, City Council for the City of Richwood, City of Richwood, Chris Drennen, Chris McKenzie, Britt Nicholas, Ann Spencer, Chuck Toussieng, James Vannoy, Glen Weiler in support of #14 MOTION by Robin Brown, Sherry Chapman, City Council for the City of Richwood, City of Richwood, Chris Drennen, Chris McKenzie, Britt Nicholas, Ann Spencer, Chuck Toussieng, James Vannoy, Glen Weiler to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Williams, Allison)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Robin Brown, Sherry Chapman, City Council for the City of Richwood, City of Richwood, Chris Drennen, Chris McKenzie, Britt Nicholas, Ann Spencer, Chuck Toussieng, James Vannoy, Glen Weiler to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley.(Williams, Allison)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Robin Brown, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Robin Brown. Robin Brown served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (kew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Chris Drennen, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Chris Drennen, Mayor. Chris Drennen served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for James Vannoy, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by James Vannoy. James Vannoy served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Sherry Chapman, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Sharon J. Chapman. Sherry Chapman served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Glen Weiler, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Glen Weiler. Glen Weiler served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Chuck Toussieng, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Chuck Toussieng. Chuck Toussieng served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Ann Spencer, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Ann Spencer. Ann Spencer served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for City of Richwood, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Amy Dinaldo. City of Richwood served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (mms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for City Council for the City of Richwood, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Amy Dinaldo. City Council for the City of Richwood served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (mms)
July 29, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Norvill S. Clark for The City Council for the City of Richwood, The City of Richwood via certified mail, return receipt requested; Bob Henry Baber, Robin Brown, Sherry Chapman, Chris Drennen, Chris McKenzie, Britt Nicholas, Cara Perkins, Ann Spencer, Chuck Toussieng, James Vannoy, Glen Weiler via certified mail, return receipt requested, restricted delivery re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. (msa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Clerk, from Norvill S. Clark dated 7/29/2019, re: Requesting Service of Process via certified mail, return receipt requested. (msa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 5BECK004661. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. City of Richwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Council for the City of Richwood
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Weiler
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Brown
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Chapman
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McKenzie
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britt Nicholas
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Richwood
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Vannoy
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Henry Baber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Spencer
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Drennen
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Toussieng
Represented By: Vanessa L. Towarnicky
Represented By: Susan L. Deniker
Represented By: Allison B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norvill S. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?